Doe v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Antony J. Blinken and Ur Jaddou
Case Number: 0:2022cv03142
Filed: December 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Dulce J Foster
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (Text-Only) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b) and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Defendants' Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. #16 ). Defendants shall have up to and including March 23, 2023 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #1 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 2/17/2023. (MEH)
February 17, 2023 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Antony J. Blinken, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas.(Byerley, David)
February 17, 2023 Filing 17 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Antony J. Blinken, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas.(Byerley, David)
February 17, 2023 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Antony J. Blinken, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Byerley, David)
February 14, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for U.S. Government Attorney David J. Byerley filed by Antony J. Blinken, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Byerley, David)
January 31, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by John Doe. Antony J. Blinken served on 12/22/2022, answer due 2/21/2023. (Newman, Alanna)
January 31, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by John Doe. Ur Jaddou served on 12/22/2022, answer due 2/21/2023. (Newman, Alanna)
January 31, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by John Doe. Alejandro Mayorkas served on 12/22/2022, answer due 2/21/2023. (Newman, Alanna)
January 3, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David W Fuller on behalf of Antony J. Blinken, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Fuller, David)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Elinor Murarova for John Doe; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alanna B. Newman for John Doe; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James Regan for John Doe. Approved by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 12/28/2022. (KMO)
December 22, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James J. Regan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9966040 filed by John Doe. (Nath, Archana)
December 22, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alanna B. Newman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9966032 filed by John Doe. (Nath, Archana)
December 22, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elinor H. Murarova. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9966010 filed by John Doe. (Nath, Archana)
December 22, 2022 Filing 6 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing James J. Regan, Alanna B. Newman, Elinor H. Murarova as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (ACH)
December 22, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Antony J. Blinken, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (ACH)
December 22, 2022 Filing 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Please use case number 22-cv-3142 JRT/DJF.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
December 22, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to SEAL #1 Complaint, filed by John Doe. (Nath, Archana)
December 22, 2022 Filing 2 Redacted Document for #1 Redacted Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nath, Archana)
December 22, 2022 Filing 1 SEALED COMPLAINT against Ur Jaddou, Antony Blinken, Alejandro Mayorkas (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9965322) filed by John Doe. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nath, Archana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Archana Nath
Represented By: Alanna B. Newman
Represented By: Elinor Murarova
Represented By: James Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: David J. Byerley
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony J. Blinken
Represented By: David J. Byerley
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Jaddou
Represented By: David J. Byerley
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?