Pan v. Local Motion MN, LLC et al
Counter Defendant: Yue Pan
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Local Motion MN, LLC and Local Motion Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Local Motion Minnesota, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: David Seeley
Case Number: 0:2022cv03169
Filed: December 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2023 Filing 13 Yue Pan Answer REPLY to Counterclaim filed by Yue Pan. (Padmanabhan, Devan)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/8/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 1/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
January 20, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H Frasier on behalf of Local Motion Holdings, Inc., Local Motion MN, LLC. (Frasier, Michael)
January 20, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against David Seeley., COUNTERCLAIM against Yue Pan. filed by Local Motion Holdings, Inc., Local Motion MN, LLC. (Frasier, Michael)
January 3, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yue Pan. Local Motion Holdings, Inc. served on 12/30/2022, answer due 1/20/2023. (Padmanabhan, Devan)
January 3, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yue Pan. Local Motion MN, LLC served on 12/30/2022, answer due 1/20/2023. (Padmanabhan, Devan)
January 3, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Yue Pan re #3 Summons Issued Local Motion Holdings, Inc. (Padmanabhan, Devan)
December 29, 2022 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
December 28, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Padmanabhan, Devan)
December 27, 2022 Filing 4 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Padmanabhan, Devan) Modified text on 12/28/2022 (ABR).
December 27, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Local Motion Holdings, Inc., Local Motion MN, LLC. (ABR)
December 27, 2022 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Copyright, Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 22-cv-3169 (WMW/ECW).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR)
December 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Local Motion Holdings, Inc., Local Motion MN, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9967956) filed by Yue Pan. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Padmanabhan, Devan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pan v. Local Motion MN, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Yue Pan
Represented By: Devan V Padmanabhan
Represented By: Erin O. Dungan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Local Motion MN, LLC
Represented By: Chad A Snyder
Represented By: Michael H Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Local Motion Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Local Motion Minnesota, Inc.
Represented By: Chad A Snyder
Represented By: Michael H Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: David Seeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?