Beck v. American Crystal Sugar Company et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Beck
Defendant: American Crystal Sugar Company and Betty Dollinger
Case Number: 0:2022cv03224
Filed: December 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2023 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Matthew Beck. (Ahlberg, Ryan)
February 14, 2023 Filing 7 First STATEMENT OF CASE as to American Crystal Sugar Company. (Adams, Beverley)
February 14, 2023 Filing 6 REPORT Joint Rule 26(f) by American Crystal Sugar Company. (Adams, Beverley)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
January 5, 2023 Filing 4 Defedant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by American Crystal Sugar Company. (Adams, Beverley)
January 3, 2023 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 6th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 22-cv-3224 (JRT/LIB).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (KNK)
December 30, 2022 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for American Crystal Sugar Company. (Adams, Beverley)
December 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clay County District Court, case number 14-CV-22-4621 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9977437) filed by Betty Dollinger, American Crystal Sugar Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Ex. 2 Notice to State Court of Removal, #3 Ex. 3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Adams, Beverley) Modified text on 1/3/2023 (KNK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beck v. American Crystal Sugar Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Beck
Represented By: Ryan H Ahlberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Crystal Sugar Company
Represented By: Beverley L Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Dollinger
Represented By: Beverley L Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?