ARCOP, Inc. v. Cargill, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ARCOP, Inc.
Defendant: Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc., Cargill Protein, Cargill Protein - North America, JBS S.A., JBS USA Food Company, Swift Beef Company, JBS Packerland, Inc., National Beef Packing Company, Tyson Foods, Inc. and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2023cv00088
Filed: January 19, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: PURSUANT TO THE ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION filed in 22-md-3031 JRT/JFD, all papers shall be filed in Case No. 22-md-3031 JRT/JFD and no further papers shall be filed in this individual case docket. (CLK)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL ORDER No. 1. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on and Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 10/4/2022.(CLK)
January 19, 2023 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 9:22-cv-81947. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Case number is 23-cv-88 JRT/JFD.
January 19, 2023 Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-8) transferring case to the District of Minnesota re: MDL 3031 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable John R. Tunheim. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (pes) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/19/2023.]
January 11, 2023 Filing 8 Courtesy Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-8) transferring case to the District of Minnesota re: MDL 3031 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable John R. Tunheim. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (pes)[Awaiting Certified Copy] [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/19/2023.]
December 27, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement & Certificate of Interested Persons by ARCOP, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ARCOP, Inc. for ARCOP, Inc. (Yearick, Garth) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/19/2023.]
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONSWithin SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges as interested parties unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/22/2022. (pls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/19/2023.]
December 22, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Courts CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket EntryA party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/22/2022. (pls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/19/2023.]
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Kenneth A. Marra recused. Case reassigned to Judge Raag Singhal for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (jmd) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/21/2022) (jmd). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/19/2023.]
December 19, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc., JBS Packerland, Inc., JBS S.A., JBS USA Food Company, National Beef Packing Company, Swift Beef Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (mab) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/19/2023.]
December 19, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mab) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/19/2023.]
December 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16183518, filed by ARCOP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit 1 - Packing Defendants Share of LMR AMS Data)(Esau, David) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/19/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARCOP, Inc. v. Cargill, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Protein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Protein - North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS USA Food Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Beef Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS Packerland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Beef Packing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARCOP, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Asa Holman
Represented By: Amanda R Jesteadt
Represented By: Roger S. Kobert
Represented By: David Bedford Esau
Represented By: Garth Yearick
Represented By: Kristin Alexandra Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?