Nierengarten et al v. Mayo Clinic, The et al
Plaintiff: Ronda Nierengarten, Jessica Walz and Emily Knobel
Defendant: Mayo Clinic, The, Mayo Clinic Health System Southwest Minnesota Region, Inc., Mayo Clinic Health SystemNorthwest Wisconsin Region, Mayo Clinic Health System - Southwest Minnesota Region, Inc. and Mayo Clinic Health System - Northwest Wisconsin Region
Case Number: 0:2023cv00144
Filed: January 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John R Tunheim
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on #9 Stipulation, 1.The responsive pleading deadlines are stayed until the Court has had the opportunity to hear and rule upon the Consolidated Motion to Dismiss in the Representative Cases (Sherry Ihde v. The Mayo Clinic, Case No. 0:22-cv-01327-JRT-ECW; Kristin Rubin v. The Mayo Clinic; Case No. 0:22-cv-01427-JRT-ECW, Kenneth Ringhofer v. Mayo Clinic Ambulance, 0:22-cv-01420-JRT-ECW; Anita Miller v. The Mayo Clinic, Case No. 0:22-cv-01405-JRT-ECW; and Shelly Kiel v. The Mayo Clinic, Case No. 0:22cv01319-JRT-ECW). 2.In the interests of efficient management of this case and related cases, the responsive pleading deadlines in the instant case are stayed and shall be due 45 days after a ruling on the Consolidated Motion to Dismiss, if any part of the case remains. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/21/2023.(TMA)
February 17, 2023 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Stipulation to Stay Defendants' Reponsitive Pleading Deadlines #9 Stipulation,. (McNee, Emily)
February 17, 2023 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Stay Defendants' Reponse Pleading Deadlines by Mayo Clinic Health System - Northwest Wisconsin Region, Mayo Clinic Health System - Southwest Minnesota Region, Inc., Mayo Clinic, The. Jointly Signed by Ronda Nierengarten, Jessica Walz, and Emily Knobel. (McNee, Emily)
February 13, 2023 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Mayo Clinic Health System - Northwest Wisconsin Region, Mayo Clinic Health System - Southwest Minnesota Region, Inc., Mayo Clinic, The. (McNee, Emily)
February 1, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Tank on behalf of All Defendants. (Tank, Katherine)
January 20, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ronda Nierengarten, Emily Knobel, Jessica Walz. (Erickson, Gregory)
January 20, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronda Nierengarten, Emily Knobel, Jessica Walz. Mayo Clinic Health System - Northwest Wisconsin Region served on 1/19/2023, answer due 2/9/2023; Mayo Clinic Health System - Southwest Minnesota Region, Inc. served on 1/19/2023, answer due 2/9/2023; Mayo Clinic, The served on 1/19/2023, answer due 2/9/2023. (Erickson, Gregory)
January 20, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by George R Wood on behalf of All Defendants. (Wood, George)
January 19, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mayo Clinic Health System - Northwest Wisconsin Region, Inc., Mayo Clinic Health System - Southwest Minnesota Region, Inc., Mayo Clinic, The. (MMP)
January 19, 2023 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per (Related Cases-Non-MDL) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 23-cv-144 (JRT/ECW).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP)
January 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10018274) filed by Ronda Nierengarten, Emily Knobel, Jessica Walz. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Erickson, Gregory) Modified text on 1/19/2023 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nierengarten et al v. Mayo Clinic, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda Nierengarten
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Walz
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Knobel
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayo Clinic, The
Represented By: Emily A McNee
Represented By: George R Wood
Represented By: Hannah Camilleri Hughes
Represented By: Holly M Robbins
Represented By: Katherine Tank
Represented By: Kathryn Mrkonich Wilson
Represented By: Lehoan T. Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayo Clinic Health System Southwest Minnesota Region, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayo Clinic Health SystemNorthwest Wisconsin Region
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayo Clinic Health System - Southwest Minnesota Region, Inc.
Represented By: Emily A McNee
Represented By: George R Wood
Represented By: Hannah Camilleri Hughes
Represented By: Holly M Robbins
Represented By: Katherine Tank
Represented By: Kathryn Mrkonich Wilson
Represented By: Lehoan T. Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayo Clinic Health System - Northwest Wisconsin Region
Represented By: Emily A McNee
Represented By: George R Wood
Represented By: Hannah Camilleri Hughes
Represented By: Holly M Robbins
Represented By: Katherine Tank
Represented By: Kathryn Mrkonich Wilson
Represented By: Lehoan T. Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?