Clobes v. 3M Company
Plaintiff: Thomas Clobes
Defendant: 3M Company
Case Number: 0:2023cv00158
Filed: January 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2023 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Thomas Clobes. (Anderson, Lexis)
February 27, 2023 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by 3M Company.(Martin, Patrick)
February 27, 2023 Filing 14 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #11 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by 3M Company.(Martin, Patrick)
February 27, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Martin, Patrick)
February 27, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Martin, Patrick)
February 27, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by 3M Company. (Martin, Patrick)
February 27, 2023 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for 3M Company. (Martin, Patrick)
February 21, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Clobes. 3M Company served on 2/6/2023, answer due 2/27/2023. (Anderson, Lexis)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lexis Anderson for Thomas Clobes; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert E Barnes for Thomas Clobes. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 2/21/2023. (KMO)
February 14, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert Barnes. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10074786 filed by Thomas Clobes. (White, Francis)
February 14, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lexis Anderson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10074777 filed by Thomas Clobes. (White, Francis)
January 20, 2023 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Robert Barnes and Lexis Anderson as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP)
January 20, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (MMP)
January 20, 2023 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd 4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 23-cv-158 (NEB/DTS).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP)
January 19, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, filed by 3M Company filed by Thomas Clobes. (White, Francis)
January 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10021248) filed by Thomas Clobes. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D) (White, Francis) Modified text on 1/20/2023 (kt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clobes v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Clobes
Represented By: Francis H White, III
Represented By: Lexis Anderson
Represented By: Robert E Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Nathan T Boone
Represented By: Patrick R Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?