Dillon v. Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Dillon
Defendant: Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C. and Clifton D. Kaehler
Case Number: 0:2023cv00162
Filed: January 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/31/2023. Fact Discovery due by 3/15/2024. Expert Discovery due by 3/15/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 7/31/2023. Motions (non-disp) due 4/15/2024. Motions (disp) due by 5/15/2024. Ready for trial due by 9/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/20/2023.(JLB)
March 13, 2023 Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois: granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion to Expedite; granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #22 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #20 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion ; Motion Hearing held on 3/13/2023 re #13 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C., #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #22 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #20 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Daniel Dillon. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (BMNF)
March 10, 2023 Filing 48 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #47 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Edward J. Devitt Courtroom (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Alden, Charlie) Modified text on 3/10/2023 (MMP).
March 10, 2023 Filing 47 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Daniel Dillon. (Alden, Charlie)
March 7, 2023 Filing 46 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Daniel Dillon. (Alden, Charlie)
March 7, 2023 Filing 45 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C.. (Hargreaves, Colin)
March 7, 2023 Filing 44 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C.. Jointly Signed by Daniel Dillon.(Hargreaves, Colin)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER on #28 Stipulation for Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. Opening briefs due on or before 3/6/2023. Combined response and reply briefs due on or before 4/5/2023. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 3/6/2023.(RMM)
March 6, 2023 Filing 42 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Daniel Dillon.(Alden, Charlie)
March 6, 2023 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Daniel Dillon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Alden, Charlie)
March 6, 2023 Filing 40 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Daniel Dillon.(Alden, Charlie)
March 6, 2023 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Daniel Dillon in SUPPORT OF #10 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Daniel Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Email 5/20/20, #2 Exhibit(s) Letter 6/17/22, #3 Exhibit(s) Text 10/7/21, #4 Exhibit(s) Letter 9/16/22, #5 Exhibit(s) Email 9/26/22, #6 Exhibit(s) Notice of Redemption, #7 Exhibit(s) Email 9/24/22)(Alden, Charlie) Modified text on 3/9/2023 (MMG).
March 6, 2023 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT of Charlie Alden in SUPPORT OF #10 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Daniel Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Novel's Operating Agreement, #2 Exhibit(s) Corr. 11/16/22, #3 Exhibit(s) Email 12/6/22, #4 Exhibit(s) Email 12/30/22)(Alden, Charlie)
March 6, 2023 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Daniel Dillon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Alden, Charlie)
March 6, 2023 Filing 36 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #31 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C..(Cowen, Rachel)
March 6, 2023 Filing 35 Declaration of Adam Beck in Support of #31 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - January 1, 2020 Amended and Restated Operating Agreement, #2 Exhibit(s) B - September 23, 2022 Daniel Dillon Email and Resignation Letter, #3 Exhibit(s) C - December 30, 2022 Board Resolution, #4 Exhibit(s) D - December 30, 2022 Notice of Redemption, #5 Exhibit(s) E - December 30, 2022 Check from Novel Energy Solutions LLC to Daniel Dillon)(Cowen, Rachel)
March 6, 2023 Filing 34 Declaration of Rachel Cowen in Support of #31 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - November 16-17, 2022 Email Chain, #2 Exhibit(s) B - December 30, 2022 Email Chain)(Cowen, Rachel)
March 6, 2023 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support re #31 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cowen, Rachel)
March 6, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #31 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Edward J. Devitt Courtroom (STP) Courtroom 3B before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Cowen, Rachel) Modified text on 3/6/2023 (MMP).
March 6, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C.. (Cowen, Rachel)
March 3, 2023 Filing 30 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #28 Stipulation. (Hargreaves, Colin)
March 3, 2023 Filing 29 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #28 Stipulation. (Hargreaves, Colin)
March 3, 2023 Filing 28 STIPULATION for Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C.. Jointly Signed by Daniel Dillon. (Hargreaves, Colin)
February 24, 2023 Filing 27 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #22 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #20 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Daniel Dillon.(Alden, Charlie)
February 24, 2023 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of CHARLIE ALDEN in SUPPORT OF #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #22 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #20 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Daniel Dillon.(Alden, Charlie)
February 24, 2023 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #22 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #20 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Daniel Dillon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Alden, Charlie)
February 24, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #22 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #20 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion : Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2023 at 01:30 PM in Edward J. Devitt Courtroom (STP) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Alden, Charlie)
February 24, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #22 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #20 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Daniel Dillon. (Alden, Charlie)
February 24, 2023 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of CHARLIE ALDEN in OPPOSITION TO #13 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Daniel Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 12/1/22 Email, #2 Exhibit(s) 11/16/22 Email, #3 Exhibit(s) 12/6/22 Email, #4 Exhibit(s) 12/12/22 Email, #5 Exhibit(s) 12/12/22 Email, #6 Exhibit(s) 12/12/22 Email)(Alden, Charlie)
February 24, 2023 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of DANIEL DILLON in OPPOSITION TO #13 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Daniel Dillon.(Alden, Charlie)
February 24, 2023 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Daniel Dillon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Alden, Charlie)
February 14, 2023 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C..(Cowen, Rachel)
February 14, 2023 Filing 18 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #13 Motion to Expedite filed by Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C..(Cowen, Rachel)
February 14, 2023 Filing 17 Declaration of Rachel Cowen in Support of #13 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - December 12, 2022 Email Chain, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - February 13, 2023 Protocol for Identification of Confidential Information)(Cowen, Rachel)
February 14, 2023 Filing 16 Declaration of Patrick Massey in Support of #13 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C..(Cowen, Rachel)
February 14, 2023 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cowen, Rachel)
February 14, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #13 MOTION to Expedite Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2023 at 01:30 PM in Edward J. Devitt Courtroom (STP) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Cowen, Rachel)
February 14, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C.. (Cowen, Rachel)
February 14, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Alden, Charlie)
February 10, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Daniel Dillon. (Alden, Charlie)
February 10, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Daniel Dillon. (Alden, Charlie)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
January 27, 2023 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants. filed by Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Novel Energy Solutions LLC Amended and Restated Operating Agreement, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Notice of Redemption)(Cowen, Rachel)
January 25, 2023 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C.. (Hargreaves, Colin)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jean Morrow Edmonds for Clifton D. Kaehler and Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C.; granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Rachel B Cowen for Clifton D. Kaehler and Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/25/2023. (KMO)
January 24, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Rachel Cowen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10028651 filed by Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C.. (Martin, Patrick)
January 24, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jean Edmonds. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10028617 filed by Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C.. (Martin, Patrick)
January 20, 2023 Filing 3 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Rachel Cowen, Jean Edmonds as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (ACH)
January 20, 2023 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 23-cv-162 ECT/LIB.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
January 20, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to Federal Court from Ramsey County District Court, case number 62-CV-23-32 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10023429) filed by Clifton D. Kaehler, Novel Energy Solutions LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service) (Martin, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillon v. Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Dillon
Represented By: Charlie R Alden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novel Energy Solutions L.L.C.
Represented By: Colin H. Hargreaves
Represented By: Patrick R Martin
Represented By: Jean Morrow Edmonds
Represented By: Rachel B Cowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifton D. Kaehler
Represented By: Colin H. Hargreaves
Represented By: Patrick R Martin
Represented By: Jean Morrow Edmonds
Represented By: Rachel B Cowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?