Roers v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Alan J Roers and Alan J. Roers
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Bank of America N.A., Bank of America, N.A. and Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Case Number: 0:2023cv00271
Filed: February 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Bank of America, N.A. re #20 Declaration in Support, #19 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #18 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #17 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #21 Meet and Confer Statement, #22 Proposed Order to Judge (Schroeder, Mark)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Bank of America, N.A..(Schroeder, Mark)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #17 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Bank of America, N.A..(Schroeder, Mark)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Declaration of Mark G. Schroeder in Support of #17 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-N)(Schroeder, Mark)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Schroeder, Mark)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #17 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Schroeder, Mark)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Schroeder, Mark)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Alan J. Roers filed by Alan J. Roers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(MMP) Document QC'd on 2/28/2023 (ABR).
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on #12 Stipulation. Defendant Bank of America, N.A. shall have until and including March 2, 2023 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/24/2023.(TMA)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Bank of America, N.A. re #13 Proposed Order to Judge, #12 Stipulation For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Schroeder, Mark)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation. (Schroeder, Mark)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Bank of America, N.A.. (Schroeder, Mark)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant Bank of America, N.A. shall have until and including February 23, 2023 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/14/2023. (TMA)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (TMA)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Bank of America, N.A. re #7 Proposed Order to Judge, #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Schroeder, Mark)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Bank of America, N.A..(Schroeder, Mark)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Schroeder, Mark)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY by Alan J. Roers. (MMP) QC'd on 2/23/2023 (AKM).
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint of Alan Roers filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (O'Laughlin, Benjamin)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G Schroeder on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (Schroeder, Mark)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 23-cv-271 (PJS/ECW).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Carrington Mortgage Services LLC. (O'Laughlin, Benjamin)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number 27-CV-22-19027 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10052911) filed by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Notice of Judicial Assignment, #3 Exhibit(s) Service of Process acknowledgment, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Affidavit of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'Laughlin, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roers v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan J Roers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan J. Roers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services LLC
Represented By: Benjamin T. O'Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Mark G Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin T. O'Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?