Kerrick v. Daugherty Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Katrina Kerrick
Defendant: Daugherty Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2023cv01055
Filed: April 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Jerry W Blackwell
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 4/8/2024. Settlement Conference set for 4/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/14/2023. (HAM)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2023. Fact Discovery due by 4/1/2024. Expert Discovery due by 4/1/2024. Motions (non-disp) due 4/1/2024. Motions (disp) due by 6/1/2024. Ready for trial due by 9/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/14/2023. (HAM)
June 14, 2023 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/14/2023. Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. (HAM)
June 6, 2023 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Daugherty Systems, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Katrina Kerrick.(Conway, Amy)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2023 at 01:30 PM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
April 24, 2023 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Daugherty Systems, Inc.. (Conway, Amy)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel J. Doetzel for Daugherty Systems, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/19/2023. (jam)
April 18, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel J. Doetzel. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10211816 filed by Daugherty Systems, Inc.. (Conway, Amy)
April 18, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daugherty Systems, Inc. re 3 Notice of Initial Case Assignment, #4 Exhibit/Exhibit List, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Conway, Amy)
April 18, 2023 Filing 4 EXHIBIT A re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Daugherty Systems, Inc.. (Conway, Amy)
April 18, 2023 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 23-cv-1055 (JWB/TNL).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR)
April 17, 2023 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Daugherty Systems, Inc.. (Conway, Amy)
April 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10209744) filed by Daugherty Systems, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons (attached as Kerrick summons-complaint served), #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Notice to Plaintiff) (Conway, Amy) Modified text on 4/18/2023 (ABR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerrick v. Daugherty Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Kerrick
Represented By: Ryan H Ahlberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daugherty Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Amy B Conway
Represented By: Daniel J. Doetzel
Represented By: Kelly Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?