Gray v. Land Home Financial Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brandon-Michael Gray
Defendant: Land Home Financial Services, Inc., Liebo, Weingarden, Dobie & Barbee, PLLP and Usset Weingarden & Liebo PLLP
Case Number: 0:2023cv02082
Filed: July 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Dulce J Foster
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Brandon-Michael Gray IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF KEVIN T. DOBIE by Brandon-Michael Gray. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Acknowledgment, #4 Affidavit of Service)(ACH) Document QC'd on 9/6/2023 (DLO).
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Reply to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Land Home Financial Services, Inc., Liebo, Weingarden, Dobie & Barbee, PLLP, Usset Weingarden & Liebo PLLP. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Word Count Compliance, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Dobie, Kevin)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Reply to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion to Sever and Remand filed by Land Home Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Word Count Compliance, #2 Affidavit of Service Certificate of Service)(Dobie, Kevin)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Brandon-Michael Gray re #22 Affidavit, #23 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #24 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion. (JME) Document QC'd on 8/14/2023 (DLO).
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Brandon-Michael Gray in OPPOSITION TO #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion to Sever and Remand filed by Brandon-Michael Gray. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Cover Letter)(ACH) Document QC'd on 8/14/2023 (DLO).
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Brandon-Michael Gray in OPPOSITION TO #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Brandon-Michael Gray. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Cover Letter)(ACH) Document QC'd on 8/14/2023 (DLO).
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SOVEREIGNTY re #24 AFFIDAVIT of Brandon-Michael Gray in OPPOSITION TO #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion to Sever and Remand by Brandon-Michael Gray. (ACH) Document QC'd on 8/9/2023 (MMG). Modified text on 8/14/2023 (DLO).
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Due to Defendants' pending Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #8 ) and the Motion to Sever and Remand to State Court (ECF No. #15 ), the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. The Court will schedule a pretrial conference, if needed, promptly after a decision is issued on the pending motions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 8/3/2023.(LNP)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Land Home Financial Services, Inc. re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion to Sever and Remand, #17 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #18 Meet and Confer Statement, #16 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #19 Proposed Order to Judge (Dobie, Kevin)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion to Sever and Remand filed by Land Home Financial Services, Inc..(Dobie, Kevin)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #15 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Land Home Financial Services, Inc..(Dobie, Kevin)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion to Sever and Remand filed by Land Home Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Dobie, Kevin)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion to Sever and Remand : Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Dobie, Kevin)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion to Sever and Remand filed by Land Home Financial Services, Inc.. (Dobie, Kevin)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Land Home Financial Services, Inc., Liebo, Weingarden, Dobie & Barbee, PLLP, Usset Weingarden & Liebo PLLP re #11 Declaration in Support, #12 Meet and Confer Statement, #13 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 Notice of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (Dobie, Kevin)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to Dismiss. (Dobie, Kevin)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #8 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Land Home Financial Services, Inc., Liebo, Weingarden, Dobie & Barbee, PLLP, Usset Weingarden & Liebo PLLP.(Dobie, Kevin)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Declaration of Kevin T. Dobie in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Land Home Financial Services, Inc., Liebo, Weingarden, Dobie & Barbee, PLLP, Usset Weingarden & Liebo PLLP.(Dobie, Kevin)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Land Home Financial Services, Inc., Liebo, Weingarden, Dobie & Barbee, PLLP, Usset Weingarden & Liebo PLLP. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Dobie, Kevin)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Dobie, Kevin)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Land Home Financial Services, Inc., Liebo, Weingarden, Dobie & Barbee, PLLP, Usset Weingarden & Liebo PLLP. (Dobie, Kevin)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Brandon-Michael Gray re #5 Notice (Other) by Brandon-Michael Gray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) State Complaint, #2 Cover Letter)(ACH) Document QC'd on 8/2/2023 (KAD).
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order (Text-Only) #4 Mail Returned as the package was damaged by the USPS in transit. Mail sent to: Brandon-Michael Gray 4322 Portland Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55407 This mail was resent to Brandon-Michael Gray at the same address. (ACH) Document QCd on 9/7/2023 (MMG).
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Brandon-Michael Gray re #5 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(ACH) Document QC'd on 7/28/2023 (KAD).
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #3 Summons Returned Executed: The original attachments included a Notice of Removal for a case from Hennepin County. This has been docketed separately, see docket #5 . The appropriate attachments were added to entry #3 . (ACH)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brandon-Michael Gray (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Acknowledgment, #4 Cover Letter)(ACH) Document QC'd on 8/2/2023 (ABR).
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon-Michael Gray. Land Home Financial Services, Inc. served on 7/13/2023, answer due 8/3/2023; Liebo, Weingarden, Dobie & Barbee, PLLP served on 7/12/2023, answer due 8/2/2023. DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REATTACHED// (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(ACH) Modified text on 7/17/2023 (ACH). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2023: #2 Exhibit(s)) (ACH). Document QC'd on 8/2/2023 (ABR).
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Land Home Financial Services, Inc., Liebo, Weingarden, Dobie & Barbee, PLLP, Usset Weingarden & Liebo PLLP. CC: Brandon-Michael Gray w/ Info Sheet #2 (jam) Modified text on 7/17/2023 (jam). Modified text on 7/17/2023 (jam).
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Land Home Financial Services, Inc., Liebo, Weingarden, Dobie & Barbee, PLLP, Usset Weingarden & Liebo PLLP (filing fee $402, receipt number 4-2857) filed by Brandon-Michael Gray. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) List, #2 Exhibit(s) 1-4, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Land Home Financial Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon-Michael Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land Home Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin T Dobie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liebo, Weingarden, Dobie & Barbee, PLLP
Represented By: Kevin T Dobie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Usset Weingarden & Liebo PLLP
Represented By: Kevin T Dobie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?