Lauer v. Wisconsin Division of Motor Vehicles Medical Review Board
Plaintiff: Gloria Lauer
Defendant: Wisconsin Division of Motor Vehicles Medical Review Board
Case Number: 0:2023cv02395
Filed: August 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2023 Filing 4 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(ACH)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 9/1/2023. (KAD)
August 8, 2023 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Gloria Lauer. (ACH) Document QC'd on 8/16/2023 (DLO).
August 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wisconsin Division of Motor Vehicles Medical Review Board filed by Gloria Lauer. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Envelope) (ACH) Document QC'd on 8/16/2023 (DLO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lauer v. Wisconsin Division of Motor Vehicles Medical Review Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Lauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Division of Motor Vehicles Medical Review Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?