Davitt v. Catholic Charities et al
Plaintiff: Mike Davitt
Defendant: Catholic Charities, John Doe, Michael Goar and Jane Doe
Case Number: 0:2023cv02408
Filed: August 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Douglas L Micko
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2023 (Text-Only) #1 , #2 Mail Returned as Return to Sender-Forwarding Time Expired. Mail sent to: Mike Davitt General Delivery Provo, UT 84601 Documents previously remailed to updated address on docket sheet in Wendover UT 84083-9999.(MMP)
September 11, 2023 Filing 5 LETTER TO CHIEF JUDGE PATRICK J. SCHILTZ from Michael Davitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(kt) Document QC'd on 9/18/2023 (JME).
August 18, 2023 Filing 4 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(ACH)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL: The Complaint [ECF No. 1] is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 8/18/2023. (KAT)
August 9, 2023 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Mike Davitt. (ABR) Document QC'd on 8/17/2023 (DLO).
August 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Catholic Charities, Jane Doe(Director, in their individual capacity), Jane Doe(Supervisor-Rochester, in their official capacity), John Doe, Michael Goar filed by Mike Davitt. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per Civil(3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ABR) Document QC'd on 8/17/2023 (DLO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davitt v. Catholic Charities et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Davitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Charities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Goar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?