Phillips v. Hennepin County et al
Plaintiff: Ronald L. Phillips
Defendant: Hennepin County, The City of St. Louis Park and City of St. Louis Park, The
Case Number: 0:2023cv02618
Filed: August 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (Text-Only) ORDER: Due to the pending Motions to Dismiss (Dkt. Nos. 10, 15), the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. The Court will schedule a pretrial conference, if needed, promptly after a decision is issued on the pending motions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 9/29/2023.(TJS)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hennepin County re #11 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #12 Meet and Confer Statement, #13 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #14 Proposed Order to Judge, #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General (McLaren, Sarah)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of St. Louis Park, The re #16 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #19 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #17 Meet and Confer Statement, #18 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Zipf, Ryan)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to Dismiss #15 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Zipf, Ryan)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by City of St. Louis Park, The. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Zipf, Ryan)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #15 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by City of St. Louis Park, The.(Zipf, Ryan)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2024 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Zipf, Ryan)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by City of St. Louis Park, The. (Zipf, Ryan)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Hennepin County.(McLaren, Sarah)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Hennepin County. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(McLaren, Sarah)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #10 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Hennepin County.(McLaren, Sarah)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2024 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (McLaren, Sarah)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Hennepin County. (McLaren, Sarah)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The City of St. Louis Park re #8 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution (Zipf, Ryan)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for The City of St. Louis Park. (Zipf, Ryan)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald L. Phillips. The City of St. Louis Park served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (MMP) Document QC'd on 10/4/2023 (ABR).
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald L. Phillips. Hennepin County served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (MMP) Document QC'd on 10/4/2023 (ABR).
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hennepin County re #4 Notice of Appearance (McLaren, Sarah)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah C S McLaren on behalf of Hennepin County. (McLaren, Sarah)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hennepin County, The City of St. Louis Park. cc: Ronald L/ Phillips w/ Info Sheet #2 (jam)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, filed by Ronald L. Phillips. CD FILED CONVENTIONALLY IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 08/24/2023. (LTT)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hennepin County, The City of St. Louis Park (filing fee $402, receipt number 4-3245) filed by Ronald L. Phillips. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations & ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Hennepin County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald L. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennepin County
Represented By: Sarah C S McLaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of St. Louis Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Louis Park, The
Represented By: Hannah G Felix
Represented By: Ryan M Zipf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?