Wawracz v. Walgreen Co. et al
Plaintiff: David Lynn Wawracz
Cross Claimant: Walgreen Co.
Cross Defendant: USM, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2023cv02711
Filed: September 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 7/24/2024. Settlement Conference set for 7/31/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/2/2023. (HAM)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2024. Fact Discovery due by 8/1/2024. Expert Discovery due by 10/15/2024. Motions (non-disp) due 8/1/2024. Motions (disp) due by 12/15/2024. Ready for trial due by 4/15/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/2/2023. (HAM)
November 2, 2023 Filing 12 (Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/2/2023: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference.No Digital RecordingMinneapolis Courthouse, Courtroom Telephone ConferenceTime: 4:02 p.m.4:10 p.m.Total Time: 8 minutesAPPEARANCES:For Plaintiff(s): Ryan VettlesonFor Defendant(s): Lauren Hoglund; Anju Suresh PROCEEDINGS: Discussion of Pretrial Deadlines. Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. Order Scheduling Settlement Conference to be issued. (HAM)
October 27, 2023 Filing 11 Defendant USM, Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim of Defendant Walgreen Co.,, Defendant USM, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint filed by USM, Inc.. (Suresh, Anju)
October 27, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Anju Suresh on behalf of USM, Inc.. (Suresh, Anju)
October 19, 2023 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Walgreen Co..Jointly signed by David Lynn Wawracz. (Hoglund, Lauren) Modified text on 10/23/2023 (MMG).
September 19, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Hoglund on behalf of Walgreen Co.. (Hoglund, Lauren)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2023 at 04:00 PM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
September 6, 2023 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Walgreen Co.. (Wood, Brian) Modified text on 9/7/2023 (MMG).
September 6, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A Wood on behalf of Walgreen Co.. (Wood, Brian)
September 5, 2023 Filing 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 23-cv-2711 (PJS/TNL).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB)
September 5, 2023 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walgreen Co.. (Wood, Brian)
September 5, 2023 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against USM, Inc.. filed by Walgreen Co.. (Wood, Brian)
September 5, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10514762) filed by Walgreen Co.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) a-Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service) (Wood, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wawracz v. Walgreen Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lynn Wawracz
Represented By: Jeffrey S Storms
Represented By: Ryan O Vettleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Brian A Wood
Represented By: Lauren Hoglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: USM, Inc.
Represented By: Anju Suresh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?