Padilla v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: Nilton Padilla
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 0:2023cv02844
Filed: September 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Nilton Padilla. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston waiver sent on 9/15/2023, answer due 11/14/2023. (Karrer, Brenna)
October 10, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brenna Karrer on behalf of Nilton Padilla. (Karrer, Brenna)
September 15, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (CLK)
September 15, 2023 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 23-cv-2844 PJS/DTS.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK) Modified text on 9/15/2023 (CLK).
September 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10537095) filed by Nilton Padilla. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schmoll, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nilton Padilla
Represented By: Zachary Schmoll
Represented By: Brenna Karrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?