Smith v. Eischen
Petitioner: Darrell D. Smith
Respondent: B. Eischen
Case Number: 0:2023cv02866
Filed: September 18, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Jerry W Blackwell
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE. Smith is ordered to submit a signed copy of the IFP Application within 14 days of this Orders date, failing which the Court will recommend dismissing this action without prejudiceunder Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b)for failure to prosecute.To help complete this task, the Clerk of Court is ordered to send Smith a copy of ECF No. 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/9/2023.(TMA) CC: Smith with Order #5 and a copy of ECF document #4 . Modified text on 11/9/2023 (BTX).
October 6, 2023 Filing 4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Darrell D. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 10/19/2023 (DLO).
September 20, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J Hoskins on behalf of B. Eischen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hoskins, Adam)
September 18, 2023 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Darrel D. Smith (JGK)
September 18, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Darrell D. Smith. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 10/5/2023 (JME).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Eischen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darrell D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B. Eischen
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Adam J Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?