Nomier v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Hussein Nomier
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 0:2023cv02886
Filed: September 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Dulce J Foster
Referring Judge: Donovan W Frank
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text-Only) ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b) and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the parties' joint Stipulation and Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (ECF No. #5 ). Defendant shall have up to and including December 20, 2023 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #1 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 10/30/2023. (MEH)
October 30, 2023 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. (Decker, Byrne)
October 30, 2023 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Order)(Decker, Byrne)
October 2, 2023 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hussein Nomier. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The waiver sent on 9/19/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. (Klotzbuecher, Mark)
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. (ACH)
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Please use case number 23-cv-2886 DWF/DJF.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
September 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10545379) filed by Hussein Nomier. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Klotzbuecher, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nomier v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hussein Nomier
Represented By: Mark Klotzbuecher
Represented By: Zachary Schmoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Byrne J. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?