Target Corporation v. Cargill, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Target Corporation
Defendant: Cargill Inc, Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, JBS S.A., JBS USA Food Company, Swift Beef Company, JBS Packerland, Inc., NATIONAL BEEF PACKING COMPANY, Tyson Foods Inc. and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2024cv00419
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) NOTICE TO COUNSEL TO COMPLY PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1: ORDER FOR CONSOLIDATION. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 10/4/2022. All papers shall be filed in civil case number 22-md-3031 JRT/JFD and no further papers shall be filed in the individual case docket. (kt)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 3. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 2/3/2023.(kt)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MDL PRETRIAL ORDER No. 1: Order for Consolidation. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 10/4/2022.(kt)
February 16, 2024 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:23-cv-09586. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim and referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty per MDL List.
February 12, 2024 Filing 6 CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-14): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of Minnesota for the reasons stated in the order of June 3, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John R. Tunheim. (LF) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2024.]
February 12, 2024 Case transferred to District of Minnesota. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (LF) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2024.]
February 7, 2024 Filing 5 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-14): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of Minnesota for the reasons stated in the order of June 3, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John R. Tunheim. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota. (LF) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2024.]
January 3, 2024 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Target Corporation (Iovieno, Philip) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2024.]
January 3, 2024 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2024.]
January 3, 2024 Filing 2 Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. (CV) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2024.]
January 3, 2024 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The full case caption must appear on the summons and If there are multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included.., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CV) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2024.]
December 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation (a/k/a Cargill Protein), Cargill, Inc., JBS Packerland, Inc., JBS S.A., JBS USA Food Company, National Beef Packing Company, Swift Beef Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17416625 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Rider to Summons) (Iovieno, Philip) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Target Corporation v. Cargill, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Target Corporation
Represented By: Philip J. Iovieno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS USA Food Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Beef Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS Packerland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL BEEF PACKING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?