Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc. v Alges Corporation
Plaintiff: Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc.
Defendant: Alges Corporation
Case Number: 0:2024cv01433
Filed: April 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 The Case for Aggressive Civility, #2 Consent Form)(JLB)
June 11, 2024 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Alges Corporation. (Myers, Laura)
June 11, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Alges Corporation. (Myers, Laura)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on #11 Stipulation. Alges Corporation answer due 6/11/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 5/23/2024.(JLB)
May 20, 2024 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Stipulation. (Myers, Laura)
May 20, 2024 Filing 11 STIPULATION for the Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Alges Corporation. Jointly Signed by Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc.. (Myers, Laura)
May 10, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace Elizabeth Kane Rouser on behalf of Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc.. (Rouser, Grace)
May 9, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc.. Alges Corporation served on 5/6/2024, answer due 5/28/2024. (McDaniel, Karen)
April 24, 2024 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc.. (Pasternak, Thomas)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas Pasternak for Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/22/2024. (jam)
April 19, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Thomas G. Pasternak in SUPPORT OF #5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas G. Pasternak. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10991744 filed by Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc..(McDaniel, Karen)
April 19, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas G. Pasternak. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10991744 filed by Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc.. (McDaniel, Karen)
April 19, 2024 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Thomas G. Pasternak as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (LTT)
April 19, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alges Corporation. (LTT)
April 19, 2024 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Copyright/Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 24-cv-1433 JRT/LIB.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (LTT)
April 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alges Corporation (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10990307) filed by Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (McDaniel, Karen) Modified text on 4/19/2024 (LTT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc. v Alges Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc.
Represented By: Karen D McDaniel
Represented By: Grace Elizabeth Kane Rouser
Represented By: Thomas Pasternak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alges Corporation
Represented By: Laura L Myers
Represented By: Luke P. DE Leon
Represented By: Schuyler Gerard Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?