Lodges at Oakparke Estates Homeowners' Association, Inc. v. Burns & Wilcox, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Lodges at Oakparke Estates Homeowners' Association, Inc.
Defendant: Burns & Wilcox, Ltd. and Commercial Industrial Building Owner's Alliance, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2024cv01682
Filed: May 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Micko
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony T Smith on behalf of Lodges at Oakparke Estates Homeowners' Association, Inc.. (Smith, Anthony)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Status Conference set for 9/3/2024 at 01:00 PM via Zoom Audio-only Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. The parties can use the link below or go to Zoomgov.com and use the following login information to join the hearing: Meeting URL: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1601224970?pwd=b3Fjc010N2NhMllZL3QveTJXd1hSQT09, Meeting ID: 160 122 4970, Passcode: 012475. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 6/24/2024. (jme)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2024. Fact Discovery due by 1/1/2025. Expert Discovery due by 4/15/2025. Motions (non-disp) due 4/5/2025. Motions (disp) due by 6/16/2025. Ready for trial due by 10/14/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 6/24/2024. (jme)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 6/24/2024: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference.No Digital RecordingSt. Paul Courthouse, Zoom Audio ConferenceTime: 3:31pm-3:45pmTotal Time: 14 minutesAPPEARANCES:For Plaintiff: Andrew HatchFor Defendant Burns & Wilcox, Ltd.: Jenna BergmanFor Defendant Commercial Industrial Building Owner's Alliance, Inc.: Jenna Bergman PROCEEDINGS: Pretrial conference held. Pretrial Scheduling Order to issue. (jme)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Lodges at Oakparke Estates Homeowners' Association, Inc..(Smith, Anthony) Modified text on 6/25/2024 (CLK).
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Lodges at Oakparke Estates Homeowners' Association, Inc..(Smith, Anthony)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Crossclaim and Affirmative Defenses from Defendant Burns & Wilcox filed by Commercial Industrial Building Owner's Alliance, Inc.. (Anderson, Dennis)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Lodges at Oakparke Estates Homeowners' Association, Inc.. (Smith, Anthony)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report and confidential letters due by 6/17/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2024 at 03:30 PM via Zoom Audio-only Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. The parties can use the link below or go to Zoomgov.com and use the following login information to join the hearing: Meeting URL: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1609065984?pwd=MHpVU1h4cVhoc3p6OUFQQzJ5Z2Frdz09, Meeting ID: 160 906 5984, Passcode: 541458. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 5/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 26(f) report template) (jme)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by Burns & Wilcox, Ltd.. (Sheridan, Steven)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against Burns & Wilcox, Ltd.. filed by Commercial Industrial Building Owner's Alliance, Inc.. (Anderson, Dennis)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Burns & Wilcox, Ltd.. (Sheridan, Steven)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Commercial Industrial Building Owner's Alliance, Inc.. filed by Burns & Wilcox, Ltd.. (Sheridan, Steven)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Commercial Industrial Building Owner's Alliance, Inc.. (Anderson, Dennis)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Andrew M. Hatch as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (ACH)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. Please use case number 24-cv-1682 ECT/DLM.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-CV-24-5799 (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11039040) filed by Commercial Industrial Building Owners Alliance, Inc., Burns & Wilcox, Ltd.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Notice of Filing in State Court, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bergman, Jenna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lodges at Oakparke Estates Homeowners' Association, Inc. v. Burns & Wilcox, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lodges at Oakparke Estates Homeowners' Association, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony T Smith
Represented By: Andrew Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burns & Wilcox, Ltd.
Represented By: Jenna Bergman
Represented By: Steven J Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Industrial Building Owner's Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Charles Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?