Sodexo, Inc. et al v. Cargill, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sodexo, Inc. and Sodexo Operations, LLC
Defendant: National Beef Packing Company, Cargill Inc, Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Tyson Foods Inc. and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2024cv01853
Filed: May 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text Only) NOTICE TO COUNSEL TO COMPLY PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1: ORDER FOR CONSOLIDATION. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 10/4/2022. All papers shall be filed in civil case number 22-md-3031 JRT/JFD and no further papers shall be filed in the individual case docket. (kt)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 3. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 2/3/23. (kt)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER No. 1: Order for Consolidation. Signed by Judge John R Tunheim on 10/4/2022.(kt)
May 30, 2024 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 8:24-cv-01256. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim and referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty per MDL List.
May 20, 2024 Filing 13 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER transferring case to the District of Minnesota. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete, Clerk of the Panel on 5/20/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/30/2024.]
May 10, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.. Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation served on 5/9/2024, answer due 5/30/2024; Cargill, Inc. served on 5/9/2024, answer due 5/30/2024; National Beef Packing Company served on 5/9/2024, answer due 5/30/2024; Tyson Foods, Inc. served on 5/9/2024, answer due 5/30/2024; Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. served on 5/9/2024, answer due 5/30/2024.(Koons, Erik) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/30/2024.]
May 6, 2024 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ariel D. House. Directing attorney Ariel D. House to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 5/6/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/30/2024.]
May 6, 2024 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher P. Wilson. Directing attorney Christopher P. Wilson to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 5/6/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/30/2024.]
May 1, 2024 Filing 9 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ariel D. House by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Koons, Erik) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/30/2024.]
May 1, 2024 Filing 8 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher P. Wilson by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Koons, Erik) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/30/2024.]
May 1, 2024 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sodexo, Inc., Sodexo Operations, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding missing or incomplete information. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/30/2024.]
May 1, 2024 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sodexo, Inc., Sodexo Operations, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding missing or incomplete information. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/30/2024.]
April 30, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ariel D. House (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11235406.) by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.(Koons, Erik) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/30/2024.]
April 30, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher P. Wilson (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11235376.) by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.(Koons, Erik) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/30/2024.]
April 30, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc., National Beef Packing Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, #2 National Beef Packing Company, #3 Tyson Foods, Inc., #4 Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/30/2024.]
April 29, 2024 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sodexo Inc, Sodexo Operations, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sodexo S.A. for Sodexo Inc.(Koons, Erik) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/30/2024.]
April 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11232587.), filed by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Cargill, Inc., #3 Summons to Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, #4 Summons to National Beef Packing Company, #5 Summons to Tyson Foods, Inc., #6 Summons to Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.)(Koons, Erik) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2024: #7 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet) (hmls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from Maryland on 5/30/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sodexo, Inc. et al v. Cargill, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Beef Packing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sodexo, Inc.
Represented By: Erik Thomas Koons
Represented By: Ariel D. House
Represented By: Christopher P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sodexo Operations, LLC
Represented By: Erik Thomas Koons
Represented By: Ariel D. House
Represented By: Christopher P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?