Turnberry Townhome Association v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Turnberry Townhome Association
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 0:2024cv01947
Filed: May 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2024. Fact Discovery due by 1/1/2025. Expert Discovery due by 4/15/2025. Motions (non-disp) due 1/1/2025. Motions (disp) due by 4/15/2025. Ready for trial due by 8/15/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/18/2024. (HAM)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/18/2024: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference.No Digital RecordingMinneapolis Courthouse, Courtroom Telephone ConferenceTime: 9:30 a.m.9:43 a.m.Total Time: 13 minutesAPPEARANCES:For Plaintiff(s): Brock AltonFor Defendant(s): Lindsey Streicher; Scott Williams PROCEEDINGS: Discussion of Pretrial Deadlines. Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. (HAM)
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Turnberry Townhome Association. Jointly Signed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Alton, Brock)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brock P Alton (Alton, Brock)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Turnberry Townhome Association. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Compliance)(Alton, Brock) Modified text on 5/29/2024 (ABR).
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Turnberry Townhome Association. (Alton, Brock)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Turnberry Townhome Association. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Compliance)(Alton, Brock) Modified text on 5/28/2024 (ABR).
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2024 at 09:30 AM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brock P Alton on behalf of Turnberry Townhome Association. (Alton, Brock)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 State Farm's ANSWER to Complaint filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service re Answer) (Streicher, Lindsey)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 24-cv-1947 SRN/TNL.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Williams on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Streicher, Lindsey) Modified text on 5/24/2024 (ABR).
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey A Streicher on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Streicher, Lindsey)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Streicher, Lindsey) Modified text on 5/24/2024 (ABR).
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11070782) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Streicher, Lindsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turnberry Townhome Association v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Scott G Williams
Represented By: Lindsey A Streicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turnberry Townhome Association
Represented By: Brock P Alton
Represented By: Brenda Sauro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?