Williams v. Ramsey County ADC et al
Plaintiff: DeLaQuay Williams
Defendant: Christine Satriano and Ramsey County ADC
Case Number: 0:2024cv02618
Filed: July 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Dulce J Foster
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Action required by September 17, 2024. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 8/27/2024. (MEH)
August 26, 2024 Filing 7 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by DeLaQuay Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MKB)
August 23, 2024 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk's Office to DeLaQuay Williams re: #5 Letter to Clerk's Office. (MKB)
August 22, 2024 Filing 5 LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from DeLaQuay Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MKB)
August 12, 2024 (Text-Only) #3 Mail Returned as Released from Custody/No Longer at Facility. Mail sent to: DeLeQuay Williams 425 Grove Street St. Paul, MN 55101 Mail resent to: DeLeQuay Williams Chisago County Jail 15230 Per Road Center City, MN 55012 Address written on envelope, confirmed via the Chisago County Jail inmate roster. (ACH) Modified text on 8/12/2024 (ACH). Document QC'd on 8/27/2024 (ABR).
August 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Action required by August 27, 2024. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 8/27/2024. (MEH)
August 2, 2024 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by DeLaQuay Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt)
July 3, 2024 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Williams. (MKB)
July 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ramsey County ADC, Ramsey County ADC's, Christine Satriano filed by DeLaQuay Williams. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per Civil (3rd, 4th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (MKB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Ramsey County ADC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Satriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramsey County ADC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeLaQuay Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?