King v. Belinger et al
Plaintiff: Arron Scott King, Sr
Defendant: Trisha Williams and Belinger
Case Number: 0:2024cv02701
Filed: July 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2024 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION #4 Judgment. Added updated Civil Notice-Appeal and Appeal Packet 1983 and remailed to plaintiff. (JME)
July 24, 2024 Filing 4 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal, #2 Appeal Packet)(JME) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2024: #3 Updated Civil Notice-Appeal and Updated Appeal Packet 1983) (JME).
July 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: This matter is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b). LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 7/23/2024.(RMM)
July 12, 2024 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Arron Scott King, Sr (jam)
July 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Belinger, Trisha Williams filed by Arron Scott King, Sr. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 5th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jam) Document QC'd on 8/22/2024 (ACH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Belinger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trisha Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arron Scott King, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?