Coleman v. Ramsey County Jail
Plaintiff: Perry K Coleman
Defendant: Ramsey County Jail
Case Number: 0:2024cv02775
Filed: July 17, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2024 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Perry K Coleman. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/11/2024. (TJB)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/19/2024. (TJB)
July 17, 2024 Filing 3 EXHIBIT re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Perry K Coleman filed by Perry K Coleman.(jam) Document QC'd on 8/20/2024 (JME).
July 17, 2024 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Perry K Coleman. (jam) Document QC'd on 8/20/2024 (JME).
July 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ramsey County Jail filed by Perry K Coleman. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per 3rd, 4th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (jam) Document QC'd on 8/20/2024 (JME).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Ramsey County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramsey County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry K Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?