Vipond v. DeGroat et al
Plaintiff: David Vipond
Defendant: Dustin Roy and David DeGroat
Case Number: 0:2024cv03125
Filed: August 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 25 U.S.C. ยง 640 Indian Tribal Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jane Garrett Steadman for Dustin Roy. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/23/2024. (CNO)
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Cory Jay Albright for Dustin Roy. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/23/2024. (CNO)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jane G. Steadman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-11359124 filed by Dustin Roy. (Van Norman, Sara)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cory J. Albright. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-11359105 filed by Dustin Roy. (Van Norman, Sara)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by David Vipond. David DeGroat waiver sent on 8/14/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. (Carter, Courtney)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by David Vipond. Dustin Roy waiver sent on 8/12/2024, answer due 10/11/2024. (Carter, Courtney)
August 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to David DeGroat, Dustin Roy. (MKB)
August 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against David DeGroat, Dustin Roy. filed by David Vipond. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exs. 1-10) (Carter, Courtney)
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to David A. DeGroat, Monica Hedstrom. (kt)
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per 6th Division Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 24-cv-3125 KMM/LIB.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kt)
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11238323) filed by David Vipond. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exs. 1-10, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Carter, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vipond v. DeGroat et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Vipond
Represented By: Randy V Thompson
Represented By: Levi Liebl
Represented By: Courtney E Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Roy
Represented By: Sara Van Norman
Represented By: Jane Garrett Steadman
Represented By: Jane Garrett Steadman
Represented By: Cory Jay Albright
Represented By: Cory Jay Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David DeGroat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?