Newrez LLC v. Dam et al
Plaintiff: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC and Newrez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing formerly known as Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Defendant: Mirabelle Akindele, Adetomiwa Seun Akindele, James Akindele, Vida Dam, Hughcal Dameion Davis, Bella Crypto Mining, Tomilola Olabisi Babalola, Ayotomide Gbemi Babalola, John Akindele and United States of America
Case Number: 0:2024cv03423
Filed: August 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey M Bryan
Referring Judge: Douglas L Micko
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text-Only) ORDER. Based on the parties' Joint Motion #8 , and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants United States of America and Hughcal Davis shall have until and including November 15, 2024, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 9/26/2024. (jme)
September 25, 2024 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, #9 Proposed Order to Judge (Secord, Erin)
September 25, 2024 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by United States of America.(Secord, Erin)
September 25, 2024 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by United States of America. (Secord, Erin)
September 6, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Gravely on behalf of Hughcal Dameion Davis. (Gravely, Brian)
September 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text-Only) ORDER. Based on the parties' Joint Motion #3 , and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant United States of America shall have until and including September 27, 2024, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 9/4/2024. (jme)
August 30, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #4 Proposed Order to Judge, #3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Secord, Erin)
August 30, 2024 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by United States of America.(Secord, Erin)
August 30, 2024 Filing 3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by United States of America. (Secord, Erin)
August 27, 2024 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan per Civil Master 3rd/4th List, referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. Please use case number 24-cv-3423 JMB/DLM.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (LTT)
August 26, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County District Court, case number 82-cv-24-3498 filed by The United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Secord, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newrez LLC v. Dam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirabelle Akindele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adetomiwa Seun Akindele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Akindele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vida Dam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughcal Dameion Davis
Represented By: Brian Gravely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Crypto Mining
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomilola Olabisi Babalola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayotomide Gbemi Babalola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Akindele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Erin M Secord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Tracy J Halliday
Represented By: Melissa Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newrez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing formerly known as Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Tracy J Halliday
Represented By: Melissa Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?