Silver Bow Trust U/T/A v. Verde Mobility, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Silver Bow Trust U/T/A
Defendant: Verde Mobility, Inc. and Michael Luther
Case Number: 0:2024cv04271
Filed: November 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Dulce J Foster
Referring Judge: Laura M Provinzino
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2025 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Silver Bow Trust U/T/A. Verde Mobility, Inc. served on 1/8/2025, answer due 1/29/2025. (Dillon, Brian)
January 14, 2025 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Silver Bow Trust U/T/A. Michael Luther served on 1/8/2025, answer due 1/29/2025. (Dillon, Brian)
December 17, 2024 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Michael Luther, Verde Mobility, Inc.. (MMG)
December 16, 2024 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT -- Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants. filed by Silver Bow Trust U/T/A. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s)) (Dillon, Brian)
December 16, 2024 Filing 11 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Silver Bow Trust U/T/A . (Locke, Kiralyn)
December 13, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kiralyn Locke on behalf of Silver Bow Trust U/T/A. (Locke, Kiralyn)
December 10, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A Dillon on behalf of Silver Bow Trust U/T/A. (Dillon, Brian)
December 10, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Michael Luther, Verde Mobility, Inc. (BTX)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text-Only) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT: In light of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #6 , the Court directs Plaintiff to file a letter by December 17, 2024 identifying Defendant Verde's last principal place of business before it became inactive. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 12/10/2024. (DCC)
December 9, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Silver Bow Trust U/T/A. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s)) (Dillon, Brian) Modified text on 12/10/2024 (BTX).
December 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #1 Complaint. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 12/2/2024. (DCC)
November 26, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Michael Luther, Verde Mobility, Inc. (MKB)
November 26, 2024 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Laura M. Provinzino per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Please use case number 24-cv-4271 (LMP/DJF).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB)
November 25, 2024 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Silver Bow Trust U/T/A. (Dillon, Brian)
November 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Luther, Verde Mobility, Inc. (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11506525) filed by Silver Bow Trust U/T/A. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dillon, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silver Bow Trust U/T/A v. Verde Mobility, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verde Mobility, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Luther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silver Bow Trust U/T/A
Represented By: Kiralyn Locke
Represented By: Brian A Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?