Purdy v. Bureau of Prisons et al
Petitioner: Jeffrey Colin Purdy
Respondent: Bureau of Prisons and FCI - Sandstone Warden
Case Number: 0:2024cv04340
Filed: December 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER TO PARTY. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/30/2025. (SB)
January 27, 2025 Filing 39 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (kt)
January 27, 2025 Filing 38 MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE AND MEMORANDUM ON TRANSFER AND BOP RECIGIVISM CALCULATION PROCEDURE/PROGRAM STATEMENT filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt)
January 27, 2025 Filing 37 LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Jeffrey Colin Purdy re: In transit to new prison. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH)
January 13, 2025 Filing 36 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK)
January 6, 2025 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM of CLARIFICATION re #34 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDUM OF CLARIFICATION filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy.(CLK) Document QC'd on 1/30/2025 (ACH).
January 6, 2025 Filing 34 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDUM OF CLARIFICATION filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 1/30/2025 (ACH).
January 6, 2025 Filing 33 EXHIBIT L re #32 MOTION TO APPROVE EXHIBIT K TO BE FILED filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy.(CLK)
January 6, 2025 Filing 32 MOTION TO APPROVE EXHIBIT K TO BE FILED filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) Modified text on 1/7/2025 (CLK).
December 30, 2024 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Inmate Filing by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (MKB) Document QC'd on 1/30/2025 (ACH).
December 30, 2024 Filing 30 EXHIBIT filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy.(MKB) Document QC'd on 1/30/2025 (ACH).
December 30, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION to Strike Respondent's Answer filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (MKB) Document QC'd on 1/30/2025 (ACH).
December 30, 2024 Filing 28 MOTION to Expedite Evidentiary Hearing and Ruling filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (MKB) Document QC'd on 1/30/2025 (ACH).
December 30, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION to Preserve Amendment/Notice of Preservation of Right filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (MKB) Document QC'd on 1/30/2025 (ACH).
December 30, 2024 Filing 26 RESPONSE re #17 Response filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MKB) Document QC'd on 1/30/2025 (ACH).
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Reply due by 1/17/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/30/2024. (TJB)
December 19, 2024 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bureau of Prisons, FCI - Sandstone Warden re #18 Declaration, #19 Declaration, #17 Response (Rau, Kristen)
December 18, 2024 Filing 24 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (ACH) Document QC'd on 1/22/2025 (BTX).
December 18, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (ACH) Document QC'd on 1/22/2025 (BTX).
December 18, 2024 Filing 22 Statement of Kory Lussier in Support of #21 MOTION to Expand the Record/Memorandum in Support filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s))(ACH) Document QC'd on 1/22/2025 (BTX).
December 18, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION to Expand the Record/Memorandum in Support filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ACH) Document QC'd on 1/22/2025 (BTX).
December 18, 2024 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Jason Bradley re #17 Response by Bureau of Prisons, FCI - Sandstone Warden . (Attachments: #1 Bradley Decl. Exhibit A, #2 Bradley Decl. Exhibit B, #3 Bradley Decl. Exhibit C, #4 Bradley Decl. Exhibit D, #5 Bradley Decl. Exhibit E, #6 Bradley Decl. Exhibit F, #7 Bradley Decl. Exhibit G)(Rau, Kristen)
December 18, 2024 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Matthew Apple re #17 Response by Bureau of Prisons, FCI - Sandstone Warden . (Attachments: #1 Apple Decl. Exhibit A, #2 Apple Decl. Exhibit B, #3 Apple Decl. Exhibit C, #4 Apple Decl. Exhibit D, #5 Apple Decl. Exhibit E, #6 Apple Decl. Exhibit F, #7 Apple Decl. Exhibit G, #8 Apple Decl. Exhibit H, #9 Apple Decl. Exhibit I, #10 Apple Decl. Exhibit J)(Rau, Kristen)
December 18, 2024 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Bureau of Prisons, FCI - Sandstone Warden.(Rau, Kristen)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER in Response to #10 Request (non-motion). Bureau of Prisons answer due 12/18/2024; FCI - Sandstone Warden answer due 12/18/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/18/2024. (TJB)
December 17, 2024 Filing 15 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE/MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (ACH) Document QC'd on 1/22/2025 (BTX).
December 17, 2024 Filing 14 EXHIBIT re #13 MOTION to Expand the Record filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy.(ACH) Document QC'd on 1/22/2025 (BTX).
December 17, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Expand the Record filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH) Document QC'd on 1/22/2025 (BTX).
December 16, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bureau of Prisons, FCI - Sandstone Warden re #10 Request (non-motion), #11 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (Rau, Kristen)
December 16, 2024 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Request (non-motion). (Rau, Kristen)
December 16, 2024 Filing 10 REQUEST to Extend Time to Respond to Petition by Bureau of Prisons, FCI - Sandstone Warden. (Rau, Kristen)
December 6, 2024 Filing 9 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (CLK) Document QC'd on 1/8/2025 (ACH).
December 6, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 1/8/2025 (ACH).
December 5, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Elise Rau on behalf of Bureau of Prisons, FCI - Sandstone Warden. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rau, Kristen)
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/4/2024. (TJB)
December 3, 2024 Filing 5 STATEMENT by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (Attachments: #1 Addendum, #2 Documents/Evidence Requested, #3 Exhibit(s))(CLK) Document QC'd on 1/8/2025 (ACH).
December 3, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Expand/Supplement Record filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 1/8/2025 (ACH).
December 2, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite Purdy's November 2241 Petition filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (jam) Document QC'd on 12/16/2024 (JME).
December 2, 2024 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. (jam) Document QC'd on 12/16/2024 (JME).
December 2, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jeffrey Colin Purdy. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per 5th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (jam) Document QC'd on 12/16/2024 (JME).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purdy v. Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FCI - Sandstone Warden
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey Colin Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?