Grenier v. St. Louis County et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Mary Grenier
Defendant: St. Louis County and State of Minnesota
Case Number: 0:2024cv04449
Filed: December 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Laura M Provinzino
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2025 Filing 14 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal filed by Barbara Mary Grenier. (MMG)
February 4, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 8TH CIRCUIT as to #10 Judgment, #9 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Barbara Mary Grenier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(MMG)
January 30, 2025 Filing 12 LETTER from Judge Laura M. Provinzino in response to #11 Letter to District Judge. (TJC) cc: Grenier. (kt)
January 29, 2025 Filing 11 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Barbara Mary Grenier. (Attachments: #1 Motion-Exhibit, #2 Exhibit(s))(MMG) Document QC'd on 1/30/2025 (MKB).
January 28, 2025 Filing 10 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(kt)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: #1 Complaint and amended complaints (ECF Nos. #6 and #7 ) are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A); the motions to appoint counsel (ECF Nos. #3 and #5 ) are DENIED as moot; #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs is DENIED as moot; Greniers request for the reimbursement of fundsexpressed in her #8 Letter to the Court is DENIED. Signed by Judge Laura M. Provinzino on 1/24/2025. (TJC)
January 22, 2025 Filing 8 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE re voluntary dismissal and request for return of fees by Barbara Mary Grenier. (MMG) Document QC'd on 01/24/25 by MMP.
December 30, 2024 Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against St. Louis County, State of Minnesota filed by Barbara Mary Grenier. (MMP) Modified text on 1/3/2025 (ACH). Document QC'd on 1/3/2025 (MKB).
December 23, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Duluth, MN, St. Louis County, State of Minnesota. filed by Barbara Mary Grenier. No summons requested. (MMG) Document QC'd on 12/26/24 by MMP. Modified text on 12/26/2024 (MMP).
December 23, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Barbara Mary Grenier. (MMG) Document QC'd on 12/26/24 by MMP. Modified text on 12/26/2024 (MMP).
December 12, 2024 Filing 4 LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois.(cc: Grenier via U.S. Mail from chambers)(JLB)
December 11, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Barbara Mary Grenier. (JME) Document QC'd on 1/2/2025 (MKB).
December 11, 2024 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Barbara Mary Grenier. (JME) Document QC'd on 1/2/2025 (MKB).
December 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Building, St. Louis County filed by Barbara Mary Grenier. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Laura M. Provinzino per 5th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (JME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grenier v. St. Louis County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Mary Grenier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?