Vagle v. Flagstar Bank N.A.
Plaintiff: Melissa K. Vagle
Defendant: Flagstar Bank N.A.
Case Number: 0:2024cv04637
Filed: December 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Douglas L Micko
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 2609 Real Estate Settlement Procedures Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text-Only) ORDER Canceling Hearing. The Motion to Dismiss Hearing #4 set for 2/26/2025 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Judge Katherine M. Menendez. The Motion will be decided off the papers. Ordered by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/20/2025.(KAT)
January 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text-Only) ORDER. Due to the pending Motion to Dismiss #4 , the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. The Court will schedule a pretrial conference, if needed, promptly after a decision is issued on the pending motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 1/3/2025. (jme)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Flagstar Bank N.A. re #7 Meet and Confer Statement, #6 Declaration in Support, #9 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #8 Proposed Order to Judge, #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Lovett, Timothy)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2025 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Lovett, Timothy)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Flagstar Bank N.A..(Lovett, Timothy)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #4 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Flagstar Bank N.A..(Lovett, Timothy)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Declaration of Timothy Lovett in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Flagstar Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Lovett, Timothy)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Flagstar Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lovett, Timothy)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Flagstar Bank N.A.. (Lovett, Timothy)
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. Please use case number 24-cv-4637 KMM/DLM.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
December 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Flagstar Bank, N.A.. (Lovett, Timothy)
December 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sherburne County, case number 71-cv-24-1688 (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11565524) filed by Flagstar Bank, N.A.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Affidavit of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lovett, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vagle v. Flagstar Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa K. Vagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank N.A.
Represented By: Timothy E. Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?