4mativ Technologies, Inc. v. Hanover Insurance Company, The et al
Plaintiff: 4mativ Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company and Hanover Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 0:2025cv00363
Filed: January 30, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Shannon G Elkins
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tomas M. Thompson for 4mativ Technologies, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins on 2/12/2025. (CNO)
February 12, 2025 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tomas M. Thompson. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AMNDC-11671294 filed by 4mativ Technologies, Inc.. (Kenny, Brendan)
February 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jerry W. Blackwell recused. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 25-cv-363 (SRN/SGE). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 2/3/2025.(MKB)
February 3, 2025 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 4mativ Technologies, Inc.. Hanover Insurance Company, The served on 1/31/2025, answer due 2/21/2025. (Kenny, Brendan)
February 3, 2025 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 4mativ Technologies, Inc.. Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company served on 1/31/2025, answer due 2/21/2025. (Kenny, Brendan)
February 3, 2025 Filing 6 First AFFIDAVIT of Brendan Kenny For Compliance for Mass. Insurance Co. by4mativ Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Kenny, Brendan)
February 3, 2025 Filing 5 First AFFIDAVIT of Brendan Kenny For Compliance by4mativ Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Kenny, Brendan)
January 31, 2025 Filing 4 (Text-Only) Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Tomas M. Thompson as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (LTT)
January 31, 2025 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins. Please use case number 25-cv-363 JWB/SGE.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (LTT)
January 30, 2025 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for 4mativ Technologies, Inc.. (Kenny, Brendan)
January 30, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hanover Insurance Company, The, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11642311) filed by 4mativ Technologies, Inc. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kenny, Brendan) Modified text on 1/31/2025 (LTT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 4mativ Technologies, Inc. v. Hanover Insurance Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 4mativ Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Tomas M. Thompson
Represented By: Tomas M. Thompson
Represented By: Brendan M Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?