Strehler v. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Donald Strehler
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2025cv00470
Filed: February 6, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Douglas L Micko
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER IN LIEU OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 3/24/2025. (jme)
March 24, 2025 Filing 10 (Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 3/24/2025: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference.No Digital RecordingSt. Paul Courthouse, Zoom Audio ConferenceTime: 1:09pm-1:13pmTotal Time: 4 minutesAPPEARANCES:For Plaintiff: Anthony RemickFor Defendant: Daniel Berglund PROCEEDINGS: Pretrial conference held. Order to issue. (jme)
March 10, 2025 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Donald Strehler. Jointly Signed by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company.(Remick, Anthony)
February 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Rule 26 Meeting Report and confidential letters due by 3/17/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2025 at 01:00 PM via Zoom Audio-only Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. The parties can use the link below or go to Zoomgov.com and use the following login information to join the hearing: Meeting URL: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1606682947?pwd=PqBuio3F2qDXl7OIxDez1Bs5lWpG9Q.1, Meeting ID: 160 668 2947, Passcode: 962589. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 2/10/2025. (Attachments: #1 R26(f) Template, #2 Consent form) (jme)
February 7, 2025 Filing 7 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. COMPLAINT and Summons against State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11661870) filed by Donald Strehler. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service) (Remick, Anthony) Modified text on 2/7/2025 (CLK).
February 7, 2025 Filing 6 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. Please use case number 25-cv-470 KMM/DLM.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK)
February 6, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Marie Johnson on behalf of State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (Johnson, Laura)
February 6, 2025 Filing 4 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to Complaint filed by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (Berglund, Daniel)
February 6, 2025 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (Berglund, Daniel)
February 6, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W Berglund on behalf of State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (Berglund, Daniel)
February 6, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION from Hennepin County District Court, case number do not have yet (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11659068) filed by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Summons & Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal Def Notice of Filing Ntc of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Def Civil Cover Sheet) (Berglund, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strehler v. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Strehler
Represented By: Anthony Alton Remick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Marie Johnson
Represented By: Daniel W Berglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?