Giles v. American Select Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Herbert Giles
Defendant: American Select Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2025cv00647
Filed: February 19, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Shannon G Elkins
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/23/2025. Fact Discovery due by 11/14/2025. Expert Discovery due by 3/6/2026. Motions (non-disp) due 11/14/2025. Motions (disp) due by 3/6/2026. Ready for trial due by 7/6/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins on 4/9/2025. (HAM)
April 9, 2025 Filing 15 (Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins on 4/9/2025: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference.No Digital RecordingSt. Paul Courthouse, Courtroom Telephone ConferenceTime: 2:58 p.m.3:10 p.m.Total Time: 12 minutesAPPEARANCES:For Plaintiff(s): Nathan Michael MausFor Defendant(s): Michael Rowley PROCEEDINGS: Discussion of Pretrial Deadlines and Settlement. Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. (HAM)
April 8, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins on 4/8/2025.(BH) Modified text on 4/9/2025 (ABR).
March 31, 2025 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation. (Rowley, Michael)
March 31, 2025 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Protective Order by American Select Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Herbert Giles and American Select Insurance Company. (Rowley, Michael)
March 31, 2025 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by American Select Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Herbert Giles and American Select Insurance Company.(Rowley, Michael)
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/2/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2025 at 03:00 PM via Zoom Audio-only Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins on 3/4/2025. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) Report Template, #2 Consent Form) (HAM)
March 3, 2025 Filing 9 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number 27-CV-25-2839 filed by American Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Service) (Rowley, Michael)
February 21, 2025 Filing 8 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2025 at 09:00 AM. (Dkt. No. 6.) The Pretrial Conference will be rescheduled after Defendant responds to the Courts order regarding subject matter jurisdiction. (Dkt. No. 7.) (BH)
February 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Amend the Notice of Removal to Adequately Plead Subject Matter Jurisdiction. See order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins on 2/21/2025. (BH)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/20/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2025 at 09:00 AM via Zoom Audio-only Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins on 2/20/2025. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) Report Template, #2 Consent Form) (HAM)
February 19, 2025 Filing 5 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR//Summons Issued as to American Select Insurance Company. (ACH) Modified text on 2/24/2025 (ACH).
February 19, 2025 Filing 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins. Please use case number 25-cv-647 SRN/SGE.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
February 19, 2025 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for American Select Insurance Company. (Rowley, Michael)
February 19, 2025 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by American Select Insurance Company. (Rowley, Michael)
February 19, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin, case number 27-CV-25-2839 (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11686364) filed by American Select Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rowley, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giles v. American Select Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Giles
Represented By: Nathan Michael Maus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael S Rowley
Represented By: Gregory J Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?