Schultz v. Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Joseph Schultz
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2025cv00658
Filed: February 20, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2025 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Owners Insurance Company. (Kelly, Sean)
March 27, 2025 Filing 9 First STATEMENT OF CASE as to Joseph Schultz. (Bjerke, Nathan)
March 27, 2025 Filing 8 REPORT Rule 26(f) by Joseph Schultz. (Bjerke, Nathan)
February 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/27/2025. (Attachments: #1 The Case of Aggressive Civility, #2 Consent Form)(JLB)
February 27, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan H Bjerke on behalf of Joseph Schultz. (Bjerke, Nathan)
February 20, 2025 Filing 5 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 5th Division Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 25-cv-658 (PJS/LIB).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP)
February 20, 2025 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Owners Insurance Company. (Wood, Brian)
February 20, 2025 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Owners Insurance Company. (Wood, Brian)
February 20, 2025 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Wood, Brian)
February 20, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11689391) filed by Owners Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit(s) A-Summons and Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wood, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schultz v. Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Schultz
Represented By: Nathan H Bjerke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Sean Kelly
Represented By: Brian A Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?