Byrom v. Epps et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv00142
Filed: May 16, 2006
Court: Mississippi Northern District Court
Office: Eastern Division Office
Presiding Judge: Michael P. Mills
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Petitioner's 50 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Michael P. Mills on 9/14/2010. (lpm, USDC)
July 5, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER. Signed by Michael P. Mills on 7/5/2011. (lpm)
August 22, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Michael P. Mills on 8/22/2011. (lpm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrom v. Epps et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.