Baker v. Holman et al
Case Number: 1:2009cv00036
Filed: February 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern Division Office
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: Jerry A. Davis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 131 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Alternatively for a New Trial on Damages. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/13/2011. (kmc)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 115 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/4/2010. (kmc)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 70 Western Surety Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 4/5/2010. (khj, USDC)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 28 Plaintiff's First Motion for Default Judgment As to Defendant Rogers Lee Holman. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/12/2010. (khj, USDC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Holman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?