Powertrain, Inc. v. Ma et al
Plaintiff: Powertrain, Inc.
Defendant: Joyce Ma and Best Machinery & Electrical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00105
Filed: May 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: Tishomingo
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: Jerry A. Davis
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER denying 279 Motion for New Trial; re 283 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 2/17/2015. (dlh)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 277 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW in favor of Joyce Ma against Powertrain, Inc.. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/28/14. (rel)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 237 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 8/11/14. (rel)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 234 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 8/8/14. (rel)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 117 Order. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/24/13. (rel)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 22 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 2/27/12. (rel)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powertrain, Inc. v. Ma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Powertrain, Inc.
Represented By: Duncan L. Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Machinery & Electrical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?