Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi v. King Construction of Houston, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.
Defendant: Noatex Corporation, King Construction of Houston, LLC and Kohn Law Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00251
Filed: December 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 373 JUDGMENT in favor of Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc. against Kohn Law Group, Inc.; Kohn Law Group, Inc. is PURGED of civil contempt. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 8/12/19. (jla)
December 14, 2018 Filing 372 WRIT OF CERTIORARI denied by US Supreme Court; leave to file amici curiae granted re #357 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 USCA Letter) (tab)
July 9, 2018 Filing 371 USCA JUDGMENT as to #357 Notice of Appeal filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc. affirming Judgment of US District Court (jla)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER of USCA as to #357 Notice of Appeal filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc. DENYING Petition for Rehearing En Banc (jla)
July 7, 2017 Filing 369 NOTICE by Donald Alan Windham on behalf of Kohn Law Group, Inc. of Order of Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Dismissing All Claims With Prejudice) (Windham, Donald) Modified on 7/11/2017 (jla).
July 6, 2017 Remark; Receipt No. MSN100002719 from Kohn Law Group for $2,100.00 (See Order #355 ) (jla)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER of USCA as to #357 Notice of Appeal filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc.; denying Appellant's Opposed Motion to Stay Pending Appeal (jla)
July 3, 2017 Notice of Certification of Electronic Record on Appeal. The Court of Appeals has accepted the Electronic Record on Appeal and it is available for attorney access and download using instructions found at (#THIS LINK.) Use the login credentials provided to you by the Court of Appeals clerk. (jla)
June 27, 2017 Filing 367 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 08/23/2016 before Judge Davidson.. (Windham, Donald)
June 27, 2017 NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #366 Appeal Transcript Request : Attorney to refile as a SIGHED PDF document. (rel)
June 26, 2017 Filing 366 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Donald Alan Windham on behalf of Kohn Law Group, Inc., Kohn Law Group, Inc. for proceedings held on 8/23/2016 before Judge Davidson, (Windham, Donald) (rel).
June 23, 2017 USCA Case Number 17-60450 for #357 Notice of Appeal filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (jla)
June 15, 2017 Filing 357 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Donald Alan Windham on behalf of Kohn Law Group, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0537-1445779. (Windham, Donald)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 356 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #355 Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion to Stay. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 6/14/17. (rel)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER granting #328 Motion for Sanctions; denying #346 Motion to Stay. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 6/14/17. (rel)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ADDENDUM TO ORDER re #350 Order on Motion to Seal, Order on Motion to Seal Document, Order on Motion to Strike. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 5/15/17. (rel)
April 7, 2017 Filing 353 Sealed Document. SEALED invoices of MMS (Attachments: #1 Supplement SEALED invoices of Baker Hosteltler) re #350 Order and #352 Notice of Conventional Filing re #328 MOTION for Sanctions (rel) Modified on 4/10/2017 (jla).
April 4, 2017 Filing 352 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Invoices by Martha Bost Stegall on behalf of Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 351 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #350 Order on Motion to Seal, Order on Motion to Seal Document, Order on Motion to Strike. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 4/3/17. (rel)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER granting #330 Motion to Seal; granting #330 Motion to Seal Document ; denying #340 Motion to Strike. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 4/3/17. (rel)
February 17, 2017 Filing 349 REPLY to Response to Motion re #346 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of any Compulsory or Coercive Sanctions that may be Ordered filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Windham, Donald)
February 10, 2017 Filing 348 RESPONSE to Motion re #346 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of any Compulsory or Coercive Sanctions that may be Ordered filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha)
February 3, 2017 Filing 347 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #346 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of any Compulsory or Coercive Sanctions that may be Ordered filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Windham, Donald)
February 3, 2017 Filing 346 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of any Compulsory or Coercive Sanctions that may be Ordered by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Windham, Donald)
January 31, 2017 Filing 345 REPLY to Response to Motion re #340 MOTION to Strike #338 Response in Support of Motion, #339 Response in Support of Motion,, New Matter in APMM's Reply Briefs or, Alternatively, for Leave to Submit Surreply Briefing filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Windham, Donald)
January 31, 2017 Filing 344 RESPONSE to Motion re #340 MOTION to Strike #338 Response in Support of Motion, #339 Response in Support of Motion,, New Matter in APMM's Reply Briefs or, Alternatively, for Leave to Submit Surreply Briefing [Response to Kohn's Request for Judicial Notice (Doc. No. 340-343) filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha)
January 30, 2017 Filing 343 NOTICE by Donald Alan Windham on behalf of Kohn Law Group, Inc. Request for Judicial Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Staying Action in Calif.) (Windham, Donald)
January 24, 2017 Filing 342 RESPONSE in Opposition re #340 MOTION to Strike #338 Response in Support of Motion, #339 Response in Support of Motion,, New Matter in APMM's Reply Briefs or, Alternatively, for Leave to Submit Surreply Briefing filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha)
January 23, 2017 Filing 341 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #340 Motion to Strike re #338 Response in Support of Motion, #339 Response in Support of Motion,, Motion to Strike New Matter in APMM's Reply Briefs or, Alternatively, for Leave to File Surreply Briefing filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Windham, Donald) Modified on 1/24/2017 (cr).
January 23, 2017 Filing 340 MOTION to Strike #338 Response in Support of Motion, #339 Response in Support of Motion,, New Matter in APMM's Reply Briefs or, Alternatively, for Leave to Submit Surreply Briefing by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Windham, Donald)
January 20, 2017 Filing 339 RESPONSE in Support re #330 MOTION to Seal (Motion to File Documents Under Seal for Review In Camera MOTION to Seal Document #328 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Imposition of Coercive and Compensatory Sanctions Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Thomas A. Wicker, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Kim Karelis, #3 Exhibit C - Invoices of Mitchell, McNutt & Sams, #4 Exhibit D - Invoices of BakerHostetler) (Stegall, Martha)
January 20, 2017 Filing 338 RESPONSE in Support re #328 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Imposition of Coercive and Compensatory Sanctions Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Status Report, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Status Report, #3 Exhibit C - Emails) (Stegall, Martha)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER granting #336 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #330 MOTION to Seal (Motion to File Documents Under Seal for Review In Camera MOTION to Seal Document #328 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Imposition of Coercive and Compensatory Sanctions Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. Replies due by 1/20/2017.. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 1/12/17. (rel)
January 11, 2017 Filing 336 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #330 MOTION to Seal (Motion to File Documents Under Seal for Review In Camera MOTION to Seal Document #328 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Imposition of Coercive and Compensatory Sanctions Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. , #328 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Imposition of Coercive and Compensatory Sanctions Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha)
January 5, 2017 Filing 335 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #334 Response in Opposition to Motion, #330 MOTION to Seal ; #328 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Imposition of Coercive and Compensatory Sanctions Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. , of Opposition to Plaintiff APMM's Motions for Sanctions and for Permission to File Under Seal. (Windham, Donald) Modified on 1/6/2017 (cr).
January 5, 2017 Filing 334 RESPONSE in Opposition re #330 MOTION to Seal (Motion to File Documents Under Seal for Review In Camera MOTION to Seal Document #328 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Imposition of Coercive and Compensatory Sanctions Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. , #328 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Imposition of Coercive and Compensatory Sanctions Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - July 28, 2016 Order Continuing Hearing on Discovery Motion) (Windham, Donald)
December 27, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #330 MOTION to Seal (Motion to File Documents Under Seal for Review In Camera MOTION to Seal Document #328 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Imposition of Coercive and Compensatory Sanctions Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. , . Responses due by 1/5/2017 (jlm) Modified on 12/29/2016 (jlm).
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER granting #332 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses to Motions #328 and #330 due on or before Thursday, January 5, 2017. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 12/22/16. (rel)
December 21, 2016 Filing 332 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Pending Motions by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Windham, Donald)
December 12, 2016 Filing 331 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #330 MOTION to Seal (Motion to File Documents Under Seal for Review In Camera MOTION to Seal Document #328 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Imposition of Coercive and Compensatory Sanctions Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. . (Stegall, Martha)
December 12, 2016 Filing 330 MOTION to Seal (Motion to File Documents Under Seal for Review In Camera, MOTION to Seal Document #328 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Imposition of Coercive and Compensatory Sanctions Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha)
December 12, 2016 Filing 329 BRIEF re #328 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Imposition of Coercive and Compensatory Sanctions Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. . (Stegall, Martha)
December 12, 2016 Filing 328 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Imposition of Coercive and Compensatory Sanctions Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket California 2:12cv-08063, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Martha Bost Stegall, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Michael R. Matthias) (Stegall, Martha)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 327 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #326 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 12/7/16. (rel)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER denying #322 Motion for Reconsideration re #282 MOTION to Reopen Case and for Enforcement of Injunction Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 12/7/16. (rel)
November 28, 2016 Filing 325 REPLY to Response to Motion re #322 MOTION for Reconsideration re #321 Memorandum Opinion, #320 Order (MOTION TO REVISE AND REVERSE THE NON-FINAL OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING APMMS MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF INJUNCTION) filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - APMM Appeal Brief) (Windham, Donald)
November 17, 2016 Filing 324 RESPONSE in Opposition re #322 MOTION for Reconsideration re #321 Memorandum Opinion, #320 Order (MOTION TO REVISE AND REVERSE THE NON-FINAL OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING APMMS MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF INJUNCTION) filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Appellants' Brief) (Stegall, Martha)
November 3, 2016 Filing 323 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #322 MOTION for Reconsideration re #321 Memorandum Opinion, #320 Order (MOTION TO REVISE AND REVERSE THE NON-FINAL OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING APMMS MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF INJUNCTION) . (Windham, Donald)
November 3, 2016 Filing 322 MOTION for Reconsideration re #321 Memorandum Opinion, #320 Order (MOTION TO REVISE AND REVERSE THE NON-FINAL OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING APMMS MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF INJUNCTION) by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Staying Case) (Windham, Donald)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #320 Order re #282 Motion . Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/6/16. (rel) Modified on 10/7/2016 (dlh).
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER GRANTING #282 Motion for Enforcement of Injunction Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/6/16. (rel)
October 3, 2016 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy D Percy. For chambers contact information please see the following web site. ** www.msnd.uscourts.gov/judges-information ** (jlm)
September 20, 2016 Filing 319 BRIEF Rebuttal of Kohn Law Group, Inc. in Opposition to APMM's Motion for Enforcement of Injunction. (Windham, Donald)
September 20, 2016 Filing 318 BRIEF APMM's Post-Hearing Reply Brief on Motion to Re-open and for Enforcement of Injunction. (Stegall, Martha)
September 9, 2016 Filing 317 BRIEF re #282 MOTION to Reopen Case and for Enforcement of Injunction Against Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Windham, Donald) Modified on 9/12/2016 (jlm).
September 9, 2016 Filing 316 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #282 MOTION to Reopen Case and for Enforcement of Injunction Against Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Stegall, Martha) Modified on 9/12/2016 (jlm).
September 6, 2016 Filing 315 Transcript of Proceedings Excerpts from Hearing on Motion to Enforce Permanent Injunction held on 8/23/16, before Judge Glen H. Davidson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Phyllis K. McLarty, Telephone number 662-369-1017. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The Policy is located on our website at www.msnd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2016. (pkm)
August 29, 2016 Filing 314 Exhibit List - Hearing on Motion to Enforce Permanent Injunction. (rel) (Main Document 314 replaced on 8/29/2016) (rel).
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER SUSTAINING re #308 Objection to the admissibility of the Movant Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.'s Exhibits 17, 18, 19, and 20. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 8/25/16. (jlm)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER sustaining Objection to the Admissibility of Exhibit 76 brought forth in the 8/23/16 evidentiary hearing. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 8/25/16. (jlm)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER Setting Time for Post-Hearing Briefing re #282 MOTION to Reopen Case and for Enforcement of Injunction Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc., Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #282 MOTION to Reopen Case and for Enforcement of Injunction Against Kohn Law Group, Inc., #306 MOTION Judicial Notice : Response Briefs due by 9/9/2016 Reply Briefs due by 9/20/2016.. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 8/25/16. (jlm) Modified on 8/25/2016 (jlm).
August 24, 2016 Filing 310 Witness List - Hearing on Motion to Enforce Permanent Injunction. (rel)
August 24, 2016 Filing 308 Objection to APMM's Exhibits 17-20. (Windham, Donald)
August 23, 2016 Filing 365 EXHIBITS - HEARING; Related document: #309 Motion Hearing,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dft No. 72, #2 Exhibit Dft No. 73, #3 Exhibit Dft No. 74, #4 Exhibit Dft No. 75, #5 Exhibit Dft No. 77, #6 Exhibit Dft No. 78, #7 Exhibit Dft No. 79) (jla)
August 23, 2016 Filing 364 EXHIBITS - HEARING; Related document: #309 Motion Hearing,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dft No. 51, #2 Exhibit Dft No. 52, #3 Exhibit Dft No. 53, #4 Exhibit Dft No. 54, #5 Exhibit Dft No. 55, #6 Exhibit Dft No. 56, #7 Exhibit Dft No. 57, #8 Exhibit Dft No. 58, #9 Exhibit Dft No. 59, #10 Exhibit Dft No. 60, #11 Exhibit Dft No. 61, #12 Exhibit Dft No. 62, #13 Exhibit Dft No. 63, #14 Exhibit Dft No. 64, #15 Exhibit Dft No. 65, #16 Exhibit Dft No. 66, #17 Exhibit Dft No. 67, #18 Exhibit Dft No. 68, #19 Exhibit Dft No. 69, #20 Exhibit Dft No. 70) (jla)
August 23, 2016 Filing 363 EXHIBITS - HEARING; Related document: #309 Motion Hearing,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dft No. 36, #2 Exhibit Dft No. 38, #3 Exhibit Dft No. 39, #4 Exhibit Dft No. 40, #5 Exhibit Dft No. 41, #6 Exhibit Dft No. 42, #7 Exhibit Dft No. 43, #8 Exhibit Dft No. 44, #9 Exhibit Dft No. 45, #10 Exhibit Dft No. 46, #11 Exhibit Dft No. 47, #12 Exhibit Dft No. 48, #13 Exhibit Dft No. 49) (jla)
August 23, 2016 Filing 362 EXHIBITS - HEARING; Related document: #309 Motion Hearing,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dft No. 15, #2 Exhibit Dft No. 16, #3 Exhibit Dft No. 17, #4 Exhibit Dft No. 18, #5 Exhibit Dft No. 19, #6 Exhibit Dft No. 20, #7 Exhibit Dft No. 21, #8 Exhibit Dft No. 22, #9 Exhibit Dft No. 23, #10 Exhibit Dft No. 24, #11 Exhibit Dft No. 25, #12 Exhibit Dft No. 26, #13 Exhibit Dft No. 27, #14 Exhibit Dft No. 28, #15 Exhibit Dft No. 29, #16 Exhibit Dft No. 33) (jla)
August 23, 2016 Filing 361 EXHIBITS - HEARING; Related document: #309 Motion Hearing,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dft No. 2, #2 Exhibit Dft No. 3, #3 Exhibit Dft No. 4, #4 Exhibit Dft No. 5, #5 Exhibit Dft No. 6, #6 Exhibit Dft No. 7, #7 Exhibit Dft No. 8, #8 Exhibit Dft No. 9, #9 Exhibit Dft No. 10, #10 Exhibit Dft No. 11, #11 Exhibit Dft No. 12, #12 Exhibit Dft No. 13) (jla)
August 23, 2016 Filing 360 EXHIBITS - HEARING; Related document: #309 Motion Hearing,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pla No. 26, #2 Exhibit Pla No. 27, #3 Exhibit Pla No. 28, #4 Exhibit Pla No. 29, #5 Exhibit Pla No. 30, #6 Exhibit Pla No. 31, #7 Exhibit Pla No. 32, #8 Exhibit Pla No. 33) (jla)
August 23, 2016 Filing 359 EXHIBITS - HEARING; Related document: #309 Motion Hearing,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pla No. 12, #2 Exhibit Pla No. 13, #3 Exhibit Pla No. 14, #4 Exhibit Pla No. 15, #5 Exhibit Pla No. 16, #6 Exhibit Pla No. 21, #7 Exhibit Pla No. 22, #8 Exhibit Pla No. 23, #9 Exhibit Pla No. 24) (jla)
August 23, 2016 Filing 358 EXHIBITS - HEARING; Related document: #309 Motion Hearing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pla No. 1, #2 Exhibit Pla No. 2, #3 Exhibit Pla No. 3, #4 Exhibit Pla No. 4, #5 Exhibit Pla No. 5, #6 Exhibit Pla No. 6, #7 Exhibit Pla No. 7, #8 Exhibit Pla No. 8, #9 Exhibit Pla No. 9, #10 Exhibit Pla No. 10) (jla)
August 23, 2016 Filing 309 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson: Motion Hearing held on 8/24/2016 re #282 MOTION to Reopen Case and for Enforcement of Injunction Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. Evidence entered. Court directed briefing schedule and took matter under advisement. (Court Reporter Phyllis McLarty.) (rel) Modified on 8/24/2016 (rel).
August 22, 2016 Filing 307 NOTICE by Donald Alan Windham on behalf of Kohn Law Group, Inc. Of Lodging Stipulated Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 27 - Complaint of Noatex v King Construction, #2 Exhibit 28 - Answer of King Construction, #3 Exhibit 29 - Noatex Supp Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit 30 - Motion to Relieve Kohn Law Group, #5 Exhibit 31 - April 22 Email, #6 Exhibit 32 - April 21 Email, #7 Exhibit 33 - APMM Responses to INT, #8 Exhibit 34 - APMM Further Resp to INT, #9 Exhibit 35 - APMM Amended Further Resp to INT, #10 Exhibit 36 - MSJ of Kohn Law Group, #11 Exhibit 37 - Offer of Compromise) (Windham, Donald)
August 22, 2016 Filing 306 MOTION Judicial Notice by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 38 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 39 - Laborers.Materialmans lien, #3 Exhibit 40 - Plaintiffs Memo Brief, #4 Exhibit 41 - Plaintiffs Reply Brief, #5 Exhibit 42 - Order 02-01-2012, #6 Exhibit 43 - Plaintiffs Reply Brief, #7 Exhibit 44 - Order 04-12-2012, #8 Exhibit Noatex Memo of Law, #9 Exhibit 46 - Memo Brief in Support, #10 Exhibit 47 - Order 12-05-2012, #11 Exhibit 48 - Noatex Memo of Law, #12 Exhibit 49 - Amended Complaint, #13 Exhibit 50 - King Constructions Memo, #14 Exhibit 51 - APMM Response to Noatex MTD, #15 Exhibit 52 - APMM Memo in Support, #16 Exhibit 53 - APMM Reply Brief, #17 Exhibit 54 - APMM Response to Kohn, #18 Exhibit 55 - King Construction Notice of Non Opp, #19 Exhibit 56 - APMM Response Brief in Opp, #20 Exhibit 57 - King joinder in APMM Response Brief, #21 Exhibit 58 - Plaintiffs 2nd Motion to Amend, #22 Exhibit 59 - Memo Brief in Supposrt of Plfs 2nd Motion to Amend, #23 Exhibit 60 - Plaintiffs Reply Brief, #24 Exhibit 61 - Memo Opinion, #25 Exhibit 62 - March 24 2014 Memo Opinion, #26 Exhibit 63 - CMO 09-30-2014, #27 Exhibit 64 - Resp to Joint Settlement, #28 Exhibit Order 11-20-2014, #29 Exhibit Order Granting Joint Motion, #30 Exhibit 67 - Judgment, #31 Exhibit 68 - Reporters Transcript, #32 Exhibit 69 - Order Granting Plfs Motion to Amend, #33 Exhibit 70 - First Amended Complaint, #34 Exhibit 71 - Order Denying Motion to Dismiss, #35 Exhibit 72 - Defendant's First Amended Answer, #36 Exhibit 73 - Joint Report of Discovery, #37 Exhibit 74 - Reporters Trancript of Sch Conf, #38 Exhibit 75 - Notice of Motion, #39 Exhibit 76 - Complailnt form, #40 Exhibit 77 - Kings Letter to Chancery clerk) (Windham, Donald)
August 22, 2016 Filing 305 NOTICE by Donald Alan Windham on behalf of Kohn Law Group, Inc. to Lodge Deposition of Osamu Nishiyama (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Depo Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2 - APPMMs Purchase Orders, #3 Exhibit 3 - Noatexs Invoices to APMM, #4 Exhibit 4 - Handwritten agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Translation of Exh 4, #6 Exhibit 6 - Invoice from APMM, #7 Exhibit 7 - Invoice 111230-11, #8 Exhibit 8 - Invoice CR111230-13, #9 Exhibit 9 - Invoice 111230-09, #10 Exhibit 10 - Invoice 111230-10, #11 Exhibit 11 - Noatex Statement to APMM 12-21-2011, #12 Exhibit 12 - Noatex Statement to APMM - 11-23-2012, #13 Exhibit 13 - Kings letter filing lis pendens, #14 Exhibit 14 - Invoice from Noatex - 03-06-2012, #15 Exhibit 15 - Noatex Statement to APMM 05-02-2012, #16 Exhibit 16 - Settlement Agreement.Mutual Release, #17 Exhibit 17 - Sept 26 2012 Email, #18 Exhibit 18 - Engagement letter, #19 Exhibit 19 - Registry Accounting, #20 Exhibit 20 - Customer Ledger, #21 Exhibit 21 - May 1 2012 Email, #22 Exhibit 22 - May 15 2012 Email, #23 Exhibit 23 - Translations of Exh 22, #24 Exhibit 24 - June 21 2012 Email, #25 Exhibit 25 - Nishiyama May 23 2013 declaration, #26 Exhibit 26 - Paid Kings Invoices, #27 Exhibit 1 - Quotation by Noatex) (Windham, Donald)
August 22, 2016 Filing 304 Witness List by Donald Alan Windham on behalf of Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Windham, Donald)
August 22, 2016 Filing 303 Objection to #302 Notice to Take Deposition . (Tims, Otis)
August 22, 2016 NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #301 Witness List - Attorney to refile styled as a pleading, signed and with certificate of service (rel)
August 19, 2016 Filing 302 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kiyoshi Tsuchiya by Donald Alan Windham on behalf of Kohn Law Group, Inc. (Windham, Donald)
August 19, 2016 Filing 301 Witness List by Donald Alan Windham on behalf of Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Windham, Donald)
August 19, 2016 Filing 300 Witness and Exhibit List by Martha Bost Stegall on behalf of Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha) Modified on 8/21/2016 (dlh).
August 15, 2016 Filing 299 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson: Telephone Conference held on 8/15/2016 concerning witness and exhibit lists for hearing on motion to enforce permanent injunction. (rel)
August 10, 2016 Filing 298 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - Motion Hearing RESET for 8/23/2016 10:00 AM at the THAD COCHRAN U. S. BANKRUPTCY COURTHOUSE, 703 Hwy. 145 North, Aberdeen, MS, second floor courtroom, before Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. (rel)
August 5, 2016 Filing 297 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert E. Kohn by Otis R. Tims on behalf of Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc. (Tims, Otis)
August 2, 2016 Filing 296 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Osamu Nishiyama by Donald Alan Windham on behalf of Kohn Law Group, Inc. (Windham, Donald)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting #294 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Robert E. Kohn. Signed by Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander on 07/22/16. (sd)
July 19, 2016 Filing 294 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Robert E. Kohn,(Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1342118) by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Windham, Donald)
July 14, 2016 Filing 293 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donald Alan Windham on behalf of Kohn Law Group, Inc. (Windham, Donald)
June 27, 2016 Filing 292 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion To Enforce Permanent Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2016 10:00 AM in Aberdeen Courtroom 2 before Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. (rel)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER SPECIFICALLY SETTING HEARING ON PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 6/27/16. (rel)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PERMANENT INJUNCTION; hearing to be seat at the earliest convenient date. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 6/23/16. (rel)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting #282 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 6/23/16. (rel)
May 19, 2016 Filing 288 RESPONSE in Support re #282 MOTION to Reopen Case and for Enforcement of Injunction Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha)
May 12, 2016 Filing 287 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #286 Response in Opposition to #282 Motion, to Reopen Case and for Enforcement of Injunction Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. (Simpson, James) Modified on 5/13/2016 (dlh).
May 12, 2016 Filing 286 RESPONSE in Opposition re #282 MOTION to Reopen Case and for Enforcement of Injunction Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Transcript of Hearing, #2 Exhibit 2, Order Granting Motion to Amend and Denying Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 3, Defendants First Amended Answer to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint) (Simpson, James)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER granting #284 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #282 MOTION to Reopen Case and for Enforcement of Injunction Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. Responses due by 5/12/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 4/27/16. (rel)
April 26, 2016 Filing 284 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #282 MOTION to Reopen Case and for Enforcement of Injunction Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Simpson, James)
April 14, 2016 Filing 283 BRIEF re #282 MOTION to Reopen Case and for Enforcement of Injunction Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. in Support of APMM's Motion. (Stegall, Martha)
April 14, 2016 Filing 282 MOTION to Reopen Case and for Enforcement of Injunction Against Kohn Law Group, Inc. by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - APMM's Motion to Dismiss (#51), #2 Exhibit B - Kohn's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (#61), #3 Exhibit C - Kohn's Motion to Amend (#55), #4 Exhibit D - APMM's Statement of Non-Opposition (#59), #5 Exhibit E - Kohn's First Amended Complaint (#66), #6 Exhibit F - APMM's Motion to Dismiss FAC (#67), #7 Exhibit G - Kohn's Response to Motion to Dismiss FAC (#71), #8 Exhibit H - Order Denying Motion to Dismiss FAC (#80), #9 Exhibit I - Kohn's First Set of Interrogatories, #10 Exhibit J - Kohn's First Set of Requests for Production, #11 Exhibit K - Kohn's Subpoena to Toyota Auto Body Co., Ltd., #12 Exhibit L - Kohn's Subpoena to Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Kentucky, Inc.) (Stegall, Martha)
October 14, 2015 Filing 281 Remark; Petition for Writ of Certiorari is DENIED by the Supreme Court of the United States (jlm)
July 13, 2015 Filing 280 USCA JUDGMENT as to #248 Notice of Appeal filed by Noatex Corporation, Kohn Law Group, Inc.; affirming Judgment of District Court and dismissing King Construction from these appeals (jlm)
May 8, 2015 Filing 279 USCA JUDGMENT as to #248 Notice of Appeal filed by Noatex Corporation, Kohn Law Group, Inc., #245 Notice of Appeal, filed by Noatex Corporation, Kohn Law Group, Inc; AFFIRMING the District Court's discharge of Auto Parts Manufacturing and its accompanying injunction; AFFIRMING the District Court's denial of appellants' motion to compel arbitration and to stay proceedings pending arbitration; DISMISSING King Construction from these appeals; DENYING appellants' alternative motion to vacate district court's rulings (jlm)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER denying as moot #265 Motion to Reopen Case; #267 Motion for Attorney Fees; #274 Motion to Strike. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 4/22/2015. (dlh)
January 26, 2015 Filing 277 REPLY to Response to Motion re #267 MOTION for Attorney Fees Against Plaintiff filed by Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Appellee's Brief) (Simpson, James) Modified on 1/27/2015 (rel).
January 15, 2015 Filing 276 RESPONSE MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #267 MOTION for Attorney Fees Against Plaintiff filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1"- Second Conditional Motion for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit "2"- Email from Rob Kohn to APMM's California counsel) (Stegall, Martha) Modified on 1/16/2015 (dlh).
January 9, 2015 Filing 275 Objection to #271 Brief , Evidence cited in Brief in Reply. (Simpson, James)
January 9, 2015 Filing 274 MOTION to Strike #271 Brief on New Matter, or alternatively, for Leave to Submit Surreply Briefing by Kohn Law Group, Inc., Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER re #272 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. APMM is granted until and including January 15, 2015 within which to file its Response to Noatex Corporation's Motion for Attorney Fees Against Plaintiff #267 Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 1/5/15. (rel)
January 2, 2015 Filing 272 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Response to #267 Motion for Attorneys Fees by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha) Modified on 1/5/2015 (dlh).
December 23, 2014 Filing 271 BRIEF re #264 Order on Motion to Reopen Case and for Clarification of Order. (Stegall, Martha)
December 22, 2014 Filing 270 JOINDER in the #266 Response filed by King Construction of Houston, LLC and Noatex Corporation to #265 Motion> by Kohn Law Group, Inc. (Simpson, James) Modified on 12/23/2014 (rel). Modified on 1/7/2015 (dlh).
December 22, 2014 Filing 269 RESPONSE in Opposition re #265 MOTION to Reopen Case and for Clarification of Order [Doc. No. 264] filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Simpson, James)
December 18, 2014 Filing 268 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #267 MOTION for Attorney Fees Against Plaintiff . (Simpson, James)
December 18, 2014 Filing 267 MOTION for Attorney Fees Against Plaintiff by Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
December 16, 2014 Filing 266 RESPONSE in Opposition re #265 MOTION to Reopen Case and for Clarification of Order [Doc. No. 264] filed by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - APMMs Response to Joint Settlement Motion of Noatex and King Construction, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Oral Argument) (Deas, William)
December 5, 2014 Filing 265 MOTION to Reopen Case and for Clarification of Order [Doc. No. 264] by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Stegall, Martha)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting #263 Motion to Reopen Case; the Clerk is directed to distribute funds; this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and CLOSED.. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 12/4/2014. (dlh)
December 3, 2014 Filing 263 Joint MOTION to Reopen Case and Distribute Registry Funds by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Deas, William)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER DISMISSING CASE by reason of settlement. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/20/14. (rel)
October 16, 2014 NOTICE Cancelling Settlement Conference. Counsel advised they had reached a settlement. (dmd)
October 8, 2014 Filing 261 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2015 11:00 AM in Judge Alexander Chambers before Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander. (wsm)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander on 10/9/14. (wsm)
September 30, 2014 Filing 259 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 10/19/2015 09:30 AM in Aberdeen Courtroom 2 before Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. (rel)
September 30, 2014 Filing 258 NOTICE of Conference: Settlement Conference set for 10/20/2014 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos due no later than 10/15/2014. (dmd)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 257 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2015 11:00 AM in Judge Alexander Chambers before Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander. Discovery due by 6/5/2015. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 10/14/2014. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 3/6/2015. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 4/6/2015. Motions due by 6/19/2015. Settlement Conference set for 10/20/2014 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander on 9/30/14. (wsm)
September 30, 2014 Filing 256 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander: Case Management Conference held on 9/30/2014. (wsm)
September 24, 2014 Filing 255 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney For Noatex by Noatex Corporation. (Huffman, Nicole)
August 27, 2014 Filing 254 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 9/30/2014 01:30 PM in Judge Alexander Chambers before Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander. (wsm)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 253 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2014 01:30 PM in Judge Alexander Chambers before Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander. Signed by Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander on 8/12/14. (wsm)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER denying #250 Motion for Court Supervised Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander on 8/12/2014. (lmf)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER denying WITHOUT PREJUDICE #227 Motion to Appeal Magistrate Judge Decision. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 8/11/14. (rel)
June 18, 2014 Filing 250 MOTION for Discovery to Set Court-Supervised Discovery Conference, or, in the Alternative, Granting Leave to Proceed with Discovery by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Deas, William)
June 3, 2014 Remark; CD of Record on Appeal forwarded to Wise Carter via USPS (jlm)
May 19, 2014 Remark; CD of Record on Appeal fowarded to Atty Lawrence Deas via USPS (jlm)
May 16, 2014 Notice of Certification of Electronic Record on Appeal re #248 Notice of Appeal. Please send an email to ecf_information@msnd.uscourts.gov to obtain the record on appeal. (jlm)
May 5, 2014 Filing 249 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by James C. Simpson, Jr on behalf of Kohn Law Group, Inc., Noatex Corporation (Simpson, James)
April 28, 2014 Remark; CD of Record on Appeal forwarded to Mitchell, McNutt via USPS (jlm)
April 25, 2014 Notice of Certification of Electronic Record on Appeal. Please send an email to ecf_information@msnd.uscourts.gov to obtain the record on appeal. (jlm)
April 16, 2014 Filing 248 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #240 Order on Motion to Compel by James C. Simpson, Jr on behalf of Kohn Law Group, Inc., Noatex Corporation. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0537-1099953. Appeal Record due by 5/1/2014. (Simpson, James)
April 4, 2014 Filing 247 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST . (Simpson, James)
March 31, 2014 Filing 246 USCA Case Number 14-60217 for #245 Notice of Appeal filed by Noatex Corporation, Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (dlh)
March 24, 2014 Filing 245 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #236 ORDER granting #175 Motion to Discharge Plaintiff Auto Parts Manufacturing by James C. Simpson, Jr on behalf of Noatex Corporation, Kohn Law Group, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0537-1091378. Appeal Record due by 4/8/2014. (Simpson, James) Modified on 3/25/2014 (jlm). Modified on 4/17/2014 (jlm).
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #243 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Strike. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/24/14. (rel)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER denying #145 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #161 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying #192 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part #210 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendant Kohn Law Group, Inc. is dismissed as a party. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/24/14. (rel)
March 19, 2014 Filing 242 ADDENDUM TO #241 Memorandum Opinion re #240 Order. (dlh)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #240 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/17/14. (rel)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER denying #177 Motion to Compel. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/17/14. (rel)
March 5, 2014 Filing 239 Response to #238 Exhibits to #145 Motion for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Simpson, James) Modified on 3/6/2014 (rel).
March 3, 2014 Filing 238 EXHIBIT re #145 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Complaint for Interpleader and Distribution of Registry Funds filed as Supplemental Exhibit per Court Order. (Deas, William)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #236 Order on Motion to Dismiss / Discharge. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/3/14. (rel)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting #175 Motion to Discharge Plaintiff Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi, Inc.. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/3/14. (rel)
February 27, 2014 Filing 235 NOTICE by Bertis Wayne Williams on behalf of King Construction of Houston, LLC Notice of Attorneys' Lien (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Contract, #2 Exhibit B- Order, #3 Exhibit C-Invoices) (Williams, Bertis)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting #204 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibit. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 2/26/14. (rel)
January 14, 2014 Filing 233 Response In Support of #227 Motion to Appeal Magistrate's Decision/i>. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Simpson, James) Modified on 1/15/2014 (rel).
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER denying #220 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Glen H. Davidson on 1/7/2014. (dlh)
January 7, 2014 Filing 231 Response to #227 MOTION to Appeal Magistrate Judge Decision (Plaintiff's Response to Objections of Noatex & Kohn to Order Denying Joinder & Renewal of Motion to Consolidate). (Stegall, Martha)
January 6, 2014 Filing 230 RESPONSE in Support re #224 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Second Motion to Amend Complaint) filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha)
December 27, 2013 Filing 229 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #228 Response in Opposition to #224 Motion To Amend Complaint (Second). (Simpson, James) Modified on 12/30/2013 (rel).
December 27, 2013 Filing 228 RESPONSE in Opposition re #224 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Second Motion to Amend Complaint) filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc., Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
December 24, 2013 Filing 227 Motion to Appeal Magistrate Decision re #221 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases . (Simpson, James) Modified on 12/26/2013 (rel).
December 24, 2013 Filing 226 REPLY to Response to Motion re #220 MOTION to Expedite DISTRIBUTION OF THE REGISTRY FUNDS, AND TO SET A STATUS CONFERENCE, filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc., Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fifth Circuit Letter with Supplemental Authority) (Simpson, James)
December 23, 2013 Filing 225 BRIEF re #224 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Second Motion to Amend Complaint) Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion. (Stegall, Martha)
December 23, 2013 Filing 224 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Second Motion to Amend Complaint) by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Second Amended Complaint)) (Stegall, Martha)
December 19, 2013 Filing 223 JOINDER re #222 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Expedite Distribution of Registry Funds, and to set a Status Conference and Request for Oral Argument. (Deas, William)
December 17, 2013 Filing 222 RESPONSE in Opposition re #220 MOTION to Expedite DISTRIBUTION OF THE REGISTRY FUNDS, AND TO SET A STATUS CONFERENCE, filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - G to APMM's Response Brief) (Stegall, Martha)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER denying #216 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 12/10/13. (tab)
December 3, 2013 Filing 220 MOTION to Expedite DISTRIBUTION OF THE REGISTRY FUNDS, AND TO SET A STATUS CONFERENCE, by Kohn Law Group, Inc., Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
December 2, 2013 Filing 219 REPLY to Response to Motion re #216 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc., Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Noatex Response to Motion, #2 Exhibit Noatex Motion for Attorney Fees) (Simpson, James)
November 26, 2013 Filing 218 JOINDER re #217 Response to #216 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (Deas, William) Modified on 12/3/2013 (dlh).
November 21, 2013 Filing 217 RESPONSE to Motion re #216 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Tims, Otis)
November 8, 2013 Filing 216 JOINDER AND RENEWAL OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. (Simpson, James) Modified on 11/12/2013 (rel).
October 11, 2013 Filing 215 NOTICE by James C. Simpson, Jr on behalf of Kohn Law Group, Inc., Noatex Corporation re #162 Memorandum in Support, #208 Memorandum in Support, #202 Memorandum in Support, #214 Notice (Other), #194 Reply to Response to Motion, #210 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #180 Memorandum in Support, #212 Response in Support of Motion of Filing of Corrected Supplemental Authority Submission Fifth Circuit Decision (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Fifth Circuit Decision) (Simpson, James)
October 11, 2013 Filing 214 NOTICE by James C. Simpson, Jr on behalf of Kohn Law Group, Inc., Noatex Corporation of Filing of Supplemental Authority Submission of Fifth Circuit Decision (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Fifth Circuit Decision) (Simpson, James)
August 29, 2013 Filing 213 (USCA) ORDER granting Motion of Bertis Wayne Williams to withdraw as counsel for King Construction of Houston, LLC; signed by US Circuit Judge Patrick E. Higginbotham (jlm)
July 8, 2013 Filing 212 RESPONSE in Support re #210 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc., Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
June 24, 2013 Filing 211 RESPONSE to Motion re #210 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha)
June 20, 2013 Filing 210 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Simpson, James)
June 14, 2013 Filing 209 BRIEF re #175 MOTION to Dismiss / Discharge Plaintiff (Reply Brief in Support). (Stegall, Martha)
June 14, 2013 Filing 208 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #207 Response in Opposition to #145 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibit. (Simpson, James) Modified on 6/17/2013 (dlh).
June 14, 2013 Filing 207 RESPONSE in Opposition re #204 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibit to #145 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc., Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James) Modified on 6/17/2013 (dlh).
June 14, 2013 Filing 206 REPLY to Response to Motion re #177 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc., Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
June 11, 2013 Filing 205 RESPONSE to Motion re #177 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha)
June 5, 2013 Filing 204 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibit to #145 Motion for Summary Judgment by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Deas, William) Modified on 6/5/2013 (dlh).
June 4, 2013 Filing 203 REPLY to Response to Motion re #192 MOTION to Strike #178 Response in Opposition to Motion, #183 Exhibits to Other Document, #189 Exhibits to Other Document, #179 Affidavit, #184 Exhibits to Other Document, #187 Exhibits to Other Document, #188 Exhibits to Other Document, filed by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Deas, William)
June 4, 2013 Filing 202 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #201 Response in Opposition to Motion, #175 MOTION to Dismiss / Discharge Plaintiff . (Simpson, James)
June 4, 2013 Filing 201 RESPONSE in Opposition re #175 MOTION to Dismiss / Discharge Plaintiff APMM filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc., Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting #199 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #177 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Responses due by 6/17/2013. Signed by Glen H. Davidson on 6/3/13. (mhg)
June 3, 2013 Filing 199 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #177 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha)
June 2, 2013 Filing 198 RESPONSE in Opposition re #161 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM For Interpleader Relief filed by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Deas, William)
June 2, 2013 Filing 197 RESPONSE in Opposition re #177 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Deas, William)
May 29, 2013 Filing 196 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #195 Response in Opposition to #192 Motion to Strike, . (Simpson, James) Modified on 5/30/2013 (rel).
May 29, 2013 Filing 195 RESPONSE in Opposition re #192 MOTION to Strike #178 Response in Opposition to Motion, #183 Exhibits to Other Document, #189 Exhibits to Other Document, #179 Affidavit, #184 Exhibits to Other Document, #187 Exhibits to Other Document, #188 Exhibits to Other Document, filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc., Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
May 29, 2013 Filing 194 REPLY to Response to Motion re #161 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM For Interpleader Relief filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc., Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, Copy of King's Response toMotion for Further Relief) (Simpson, James)
May 27, 2013 Filing 193 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #192 MOTION to Strike #178 Response in Opposition to Motion, #183 Exhibits to Other Document, #189 Exhibits to Other Document, #179 Affidavit, #184 Exhibits to Other Document, #187 Exhibits to Other Document, #188 Exhibits to Other Document, . (Deas, William)
May 27, 2013 Filing 192 MOTION to Strike #178 Response in Opposition to Motion, #183 Exhibits to Other Document, #189 Exhibits to Other Document, #179 Affidavit, #184 Exhibits to Other Document, #187 Exhibits to Other Document, #188 Exhibits to Other Document, #181 Exhibits to Other Document, #190 Exhibits to Other Document, #180 Memorandum in Support, #186 Exhibits to Other Document, #185 Exhibits to Other Document, #191 Exhibits to Other Document, #182 Exhibits to Other Document and for Order Prohibiting Robert Kohn from Further Participation in this Action by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Deas, William)
May 24, 2013 Filing 191 EXHIBIT re #178 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, Exhibits 16 through 20, Invoices. (Simpson, James)
May 24, 2013 Filing 190 EXHIBIT re #178 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, Exhibits 51-53, purchase orders, bid proposal, memorandum. (Simpson, James) Modified on 5/24/2013 (rel).
May 24, 2013 Filing 189 EXHIBIT re #178 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, Exhibits 46-50, purchase orders. (Simpson, James) Modified on 5/24/2013 (rel).
May 24, 2013 Filing 188 EXHIBIT re #178 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, Exhibits 41-45, purchase orders. (Simpson, James) Modified on 5/24/2013 (rel).
May 24, 2013 Filing 187 EXHIBIT re #178 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, Exhibits 36-40, purchase orders. (Simpson, James) Modified on 5/24/2013 (rel).
May 24, 2013 Filing 186 EXHIBIT re #178 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, Exhibits 31-35, purchase orders. (Simpson, James) Modified on 5/24/2013 (rel).
May 24, 2013 Filing 185 EXHIBIT re #178 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, Exhibits 26-30, invoices. (Simpson, James) Modified on 5/24/2013 (rel).
May 24, 2013 Filing 184 EXHIBIT re #178 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, Exhibits 21-25, invoices. (Simpson, James) Modified on 5/24/2013 (rel).
May 24, 2013 Filing 183 EXHIBIT re #178 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, Exhibits 11-15, invoices. (Simpson, James) Modified on 5/24/2013 (rel).
May 24, 2013 Filing 182 EXHIBIT re #178 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, Exhibits 6-10, invoices. (Simpson, James) Modified on 5/24/2013 (rel).
May 24, 2013 Filing 181 EXHIBIT re #178 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, Exhibits 1-5 TRO application and invoices. (Simpson, James) Modified on 5/24/2013 (rel).
May 23, 2013 Filing 180 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. (Simpson, James)
May 23, 2013 Filing 179 AFFIDAVIT of Osamu Nishiyama. (Simpson, James)
May 23, 2013 Filing 178 RESPONSE in Opposition re #145 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Complaint for Interpleader and Distribution of Registry Funds filed by Kohn Law Group, Inc., Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
May 23, 2013 Filing 177 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Kohn Law Group, Inc., Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
May 23, 2013 Filing 176 BRIEF re #175 MOTION to Dismiss / Discharge Plaintiff . (Stegall, Martha)
May 23, 2013 Filing 175 MOTION to Dismiss / Discharge Plaintiff by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha)
May 23, 2013 Filing 174 RESPONSE to Motion re #161 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM For Interpleader Relief filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER denying #139 Motion to Stay; denying #157 Motion to Vacate ; denying #166 Motion to Stay; denying #167 Motion to Vacate. Continuing Case Management Conference until further order. The Defendants Must file a motion to compel arbitration under arbitration agreement no later than May 29, 2013.. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 5/22/2013. (lmf)
May 22, 2013 Filing 172 USCA ORDER GRANTING Noatex's Motion to Amend its Petition for Mandamus, Noatex's Motion to file a Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Amend its Petition for Mandamus is GRANTED; and that the Amended Petition for Mandamus is DENIED (jlm)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting #164 Motion to relieve Robert E. Kohn as Counsel for Noatex. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 5/22/13. (rel)
May 21, 2013 Filing 170 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Kohn Law Group, Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2013. (Stegall, Martha)
May 21, 2013 Case reassigned to Glen H. Davidson and S. Allan Alexander. (jlm)
May 20, 2013 Filing 169 REPLY to Response to Motion re #157 MOTION to Vacate #151 Initial Order - Rule 16.1 filed by Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
May 20, 2013 Filing 168 REPLY to Response to Motion re #139 MOTION to Stay PENDING ARBITRATION filed by Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Osamu Nishiyama) (Simpson, James)
May 20, 2013 Filing 167 MOTION to Vacate #151 Initial Order - Rule 16.1 by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Simpson, James)
May 20, 2013 Filing 166 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration by Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (Simpson, James)
May 20, 2013 Filing 165 NOTICE by James C. Simpson, Jr on behalf of Kohn Law Group, Inc. Declining to Consent to Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) (Simpson, James)
May 14, 2013 Filing 164 MOTION To Relieve Robert E. Kohn, Esq., as Counsel for Noatex by Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #138 Motion for Extension of Time, but not to extent requested re #135 Amended Complaint Noatex Corporation answer due 5/20/2013.. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 5/14/13. (lmf)
May 13, 2013 Filing 162 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #161 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM For Interpleader Relief . (Simpson, James)
May 13, 2013 Filing 161 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM For Interpleader Relief by Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Complaint form) (Simpson, James)
May 13, 2013 Filing 160 RESPONSE to Motion re #139 MOTION to Stay PENDING ARBITRATION filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha)
May 13, 2013 Filing 159 RESPONSE to Motion re #157 MOTION to Vacate #151 Initial Order - Rule 16.1 Initial Order and Stay Briefing and Hearing filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha)
May 13, 2013 Filing 158 REPLY to Response to Motion re #138 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
May 13, 2013 Filing 157 MOTION to Vacate #151 Initial Order - Rule 16.1 by Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
May 10, 2013 Filing 156 RESPONSE to Motion re #138 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha)
May 10, 2013 Filing 155 RESPONSE in Opposition re #139 MOTION to Stay PENDING ARBITRATION filed by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Rehearing) (Deas, William)
May 9, 2013 Filing 154 Sealed Document, Unredacted Engagement Letter Agreement (see Doc #153 ). (jlm) Modified on 5/14/2013 (ksw).
May 9, 2013 Filing 153 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Sealed Unredacted Engagement Letter Agreement by James C. Simpson, Jr on behalf of Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER finding as moot #129 Motion for Supervised Discovery Conference. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 5/8/2013. (lmf)
May 8, 2013 Filing 151 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2013 09:00 AM in Judge Alexander Chambers before S. Allan Alexander. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 5/7/13. (wsm)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #142 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 5/7/2013. (lmf)
May 7, 2013 Filing 149 REPLY to Response to Motion re #142 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal for Review In Camera filed by Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
May 7, 2013 Filing 148 Summons Issued as to Kohn Law Group, Inc.. (jlm)
May 6, 2013 Filing 147 RESPONSE in Opposition re #142 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal for Review in Camera filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha)
May 6, 2013 Filing 146 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #145 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Complaint for Interpleader and Distribution of Registry Funds . (Deas, William)
May 6, 2013 Filing 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Complaint for Interpleader and Distribution of Registry Funds by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit July 11, 2012 Order of MSBOC, #2 Exhibit October 10, 2012 Order of MSBOC, #3 Exhibit MSBOC Investigator Report 1, #4 Exhibit MSBOC Investigator Report 2) (Deas, William)
May 4, 2013 Filing 144 RESPONSE in Opposition re #142 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal filed by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Deas, William)
May 1, 2013 Filing 143 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #142 MOTION to Seal A Document Filed, For Review In Camera. (Simpson, James)
May 1, 2013 Filing 142 MOTION for Leave to file a Document Under Seal For Review by Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James) Modified on 5/2/2013 (dlh).
April 30, 2013 Filing 141 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #139 MOTION to Stay PENDING ARBITRATION . (Kohn, Robert)
April 30, 2013 Filing 140 AFFIDAVIT re #139 MOTION to Stay PENDING ARBITRATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT E. KOHN. (Kohn, Robert)
April 30, 2013 Filing 139 MOTION to Stay PENDING ARBITRATION by Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Engagement agreement (redacted), #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order Staying Action) (Kohn, Robert)
April 30, 2013 Filing 138 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #135 AMENDED COMPLAINT, or Moving to Strike Amended Complaint and Answer to Amended Complaint by Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James) Modified on 5/1/2013 (jlm).
April 29, 2013 Filing 137 RESPONSE in Opposition re #129 MOTION for Discovery Conference Supervised by Court filed by Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
April 25, 2013 Filing 136 ANSWER to #135 Amended Complaint of Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi, Inc. by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Deas, William)
April 24, 2013 Filing 135 AMENDED COMPLAINT against King Construction of Houston, LLC, Noatex Corporation, Kohn Law Group, Inc.,, filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Tims, Otis)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER denying #99 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #104 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying #109 Motion to Substitute Party. ; denying #121 Motion to Intervene. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 4/23/2013. (lmf)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER (MEMORANDUM OPINION) re #109 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi, #104 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint - State Court filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi, #121 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant filed by Southern Automation and Control, Inc., #99 MOTION to Dismiss Interpleader Action And Distribute Registry Funds And Request For Expedited Disposition filed by Noatex Corporation. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 4/23/2013. (lmf) Modified on 4/24/2013 (dlh).
April 23, 2013 Filing 132 NOTICE by James C. Simpson, Jr on behalf of Noatex Corporation Proof of Service by Noatex Corporation of King Construction's Notice of Withdrawal of Subpoena To Mississippi State Board of Contractors (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Simpson, James)
April 22, 2013 Filing 131 Response to #126 Objection, #121 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant, #125 Reply to Response to Motion IN SUPPORT OF NOATEX CORPORATIONS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION. (Simpson, James)
April 20, 2013 Filing 130 Response (Opposition) to #126 Objection to Reply Exhibit A. (Deas, William) Modified on 4/22/2013 (jlm).
April 19, 2013 Filing 129 MOTION for Discovery Conference Supervised by Court by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Deas, William)
April 18, 2013 Filing 128 NOTICE by William Lawrence Deas on behalf of King Construction of Houston, LLC re #127 Proof of Service of Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to MS State Board of Contractors) (Deas, William)
April 17, 2013 Filing 127 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA served on Mississippi State Board of Contractors Attn: Stephanie Lee, Executive Director on 4/15/2013 by William Lawrence Deas on behalf of King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Deas, William)
April 4, 2013 Filing 126 Objection to #121 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant, #125 Reply to Response to Motion . Evidentiary Objection to Reply Exhibit A of Southern Automation and Controls Inc.. (Simpson, James)
April 1, 2013 Filing 125 REPLY to Response to Motion re #121 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant filed by Southern Automation and Control, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Writ of garnishment) (Deas, William)
March 25, 2013 Filing 124 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #123 Response in Opposition to #121 Motion, . (Simpson, James) Modified on 3/26/2013 (dlh).
March 25, 2013 Filing 123 RESPONSE in Opposition re #121 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant filed by Southern Automation and Controls, Inc. filed by Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Letter from Williams, #2 Exhibit 2, email from Williams, #3 Exhibit 3, Southern Automation's Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4, proof of Service, #5 Exhibit 5, APMM's Answer and Defensae, #6 Exhibit 6, Motion for Default Judgment) (Simpson, James)
March 18, 2013 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #121 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant . (Deas, William)
March 18, 2013 Filing 121 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by Southern Automation and Control, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit County Court Judgment, #2 Exhibit Proposed Answer) (Deas, William)
February 6, 2013 Filing 120 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT Amendment to #115 Notice (Other) First Supplmental Status Report of Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
January 25, 2013 Filing 119 Response of APMM to Noatex #111 Evidentiary Objections ). (Stegall, Martha) Modified on 1/28/2013 (dlh).
January 22, 2013 Filing 118 RESPONSE in Support re #109 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi. (Stegall, Martha)
January 21, 2013 Filing 117 REPLY to Response to Motion re #99 MOTION to Dismiss Interpleader Action And Distribute Registry Funds And Request For Expedited Disposition filed by Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-check paid by APMM) (Huffman, Nicole)
January 15, 2013 Filing 116 NOTICE by William Lawrence Deas on behalf of King Construction of Houston, LLC of Filing of Status Report (Deas, William)
January 15, 2013 Filing 115 NOTICE by James C. Simpson, Jr on behalf of Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi, Noatex Corporation of Filing of Joint Status Report as Directed by the Court (Simpson, James)
January 14, 2013 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #113 Response in Opposition to #109 Motion to Substitute Parties . (Simpson, James) Modified on 1/15/2013 (dlh).
January 14, 2013 Filing 113 RESPONSE in Opposition re #109 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Ethics Opinion, #2 Exhibit B, Declarations) (Simpson, James)
January 14, 2013 Filing 112 RESPONSE to Motion re #99 MOTION to Dismiss Interpleader Action And Distribute Registry Funds And Request For Expedited Disposition filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Stegall, Martha)
January 10, 2013 Filing 111 Objection to #108 Response in Support of Motion, OBJECTIONS TO REBUTTUAL EXHIBITS. (Simpson, James)
January 10, 2013 Filing 110 BRIEF re #109 MOTION to Substitute Party of Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.. (Stegall, Martha)
January 10, 2013 Filing 109 MOTION to Substitute Party by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi. (Stegall, Martha)
January 7, 2013 Filing 108 RESPONSE (REPLY BRIEF) in Support re #104 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint - State Court filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Noatex invoice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Noatex invoice 11-8-11, #3 Exhibit 3 - Payment record, #4 Exhibit 4 - Statement w/invoices, #5 Exhibit 5 - Batch Summary Report, #6 Exhibit 6 - Noatex 5-2-12 statement, #7 Exhibit 7 - Rob Kohn email) (Tims, Otis) Modified on 1/8/2013 (dlh).
December 31, 2012 Filing 107 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #106 Response in Opposition to Motion to Amend Complaint. (Kohn, Robert)
December 31, 2012 Filing 106 RESPONSE in Opposition re #104 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint - State Court filed by Noatex Corporation. (Kohn, Robert)
December 28, 2012 Filing 105 NOTICE by James C. Simpson, Jr on behalf of Noatex Corporation of Filing of Certified Copy of Record (Simpson, James)
December 28, 2012 Filing 104 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint - State Court by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi. (filed in state court) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint filed in Central Dist of CA, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Complaint filed in Central Dist of CA) (dlh)
December 28, 2012 Filing 103 Copy of USDC order vacating remand (filed in state court) (dlh)
December 28, 2012 Filing 102 NOTICE of Vacated Remand (filed In state court) (dlh)
December 28, 2012 Filing 101 CERTIFICATE OF STATE COURT CLERK. (dlh)
December 26, 2012 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #99 MOTION to Dismiss Interpleader Action And Distribute Registry Funds And Request For Expedited Disposition . (Simpson, James)
December 26, 2012 Filing 99 MOTION to Dismiss Interpleader Action And Distribute Registry Funds And Request For Expedited Disposition by Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Osamu Nishiyama, #2 Exhibit Order, Case No. 3:11cv137 SAA (July 20, 2012) (Docket No. 97 in that case), #3 Exhibit Emails of September 21 and 26, 2012, #4 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit Docket entry report, #6 Exhibit Order, Case No. CV 12-08063-MWF (MRWx) (C.D. Cal. Dec. 11, 2012)) (Simpson, James)
December 21, 2012 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE OF STATE COURT CLERK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - section 4 of 4) (Stegall, Martha)
December 21, 2012 Filing 97 CERTIFICATE OF STATE COURT CLERK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - section 3 of 4) (Stegall, Martha)
December 21, 2012 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE OF STATE COURT CLERK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - section 2 of 4) (Stegall, Martha)
December 21, 2012 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE OF STATE COURT CLERK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- section 1 of 4) (Stegall, Martha)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #91 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Bertis Wayne Williams terminated. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 12/21/12. (rel)
December 20, 2012 Filing 93 CERTIFICATE OF STATE COURT CLERK. (Stegall, Martha)
December 14, 2012 Filing 92 NOTICE by James C. Simpson, Jr on behalf of Noatex Corporation NOTICE OF FILING OF ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Simpson, James)
December 11, 2012 Filing 91 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Williams, Bertis)
December 11, 2012 Remark; Receipt #MSN100001367 in the amount of $260,410.15 deposited in the Registry of the Court (jlm)
December 7, 2012 Filing 90 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Lawrence Deas on behalf of King Construction of Houston, LLC (Deas, William)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER dismissing without prejudice #66 Motion for Reconsideration ; dismissing without prejudice #69 Motion for Clarification of Order Remanding to State Court; the court's order of 4/12/12 is vacated in part; the portion of the order remanding this case to Lee County Chancery Court is vacated; the remaining portions of the order stand; clerk directed to reopen case and the plaintiff is directed to deposit into the registry of the court the amount at issue in this case; parties are directed to file a joint status report by 1/15/13. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 12/4/2012. (dlh)
October 29, 2012 Filing 88 Objection to #82 Response in Opposition to Motion, #85 Exhibits to Other Document, #84 Exhibits to Other Document, #83 Exhibits to Other Document . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Emails between APMM and Noatex, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Appeal by State AG, #3 Exhibit 3 - Request for Judicial Notice of Fifth Circuit Order) (Simpson, James)
October 29, 2012 Filing 87 EXHIBIT re #82 Response in Opposition to Motion Ex. A, part 5 - Surrebuttal of Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, part 5) (Tims, Otis)
October 29, 2012 Filing 86 EXHIBIT re #82 Response in Opposition to Motion Ex. A, part 4- Surrebuttal of Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, part 4) (Tims, Otis)
October 29, 2012 Filing 85 EXHIBIT re #82 Response in Opposition to Motion Ex. A, part 3- Surrebuttal of Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, part 3) (Tims, Otis)
October 29, 2012 Filing 84 EXHIBIT re #82 Response in Opposition to Motion (Ex. A, part 2- Surrebuttal of Plaintiff). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, part 2) (Tims, Otis)
October 29, 2012 Filing 83 EXHIBIT re #82 Response in Opposition to Motion (Ex. A- part 1 to Surrebuttal of Plaintiff). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- part 1) (Tims, Otis)
October 26, 2012 Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #78 MOTION for Leave to File Surrebuttal ( Surrebuttal of Plaintiff ) re #69 MOTION for Clarification filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi. (Tims, Otis) Modified on 10/29/2012 (jlm).
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 10/18/2012. (lmf)
September 28, 2012 Filing 80 EXHIBIT re #78 MOTION for Leave to File Surrebuttal . (Tims, Otis)
September 28, 2012 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #78 MOTION for Leave to File Surrebuttal filed by Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
September 27, 2012 Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to File Surrebutta re #69 Motion for Clarification by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi. (Tims, Otis) Modified on 9/27/2012 (dlh).
September 24, 2012 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Support re #69 MOTION Clarification of Order Remanding to State Court, and Request for Expedited Consideration re #56 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, filed by Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Simpson, James)
September 19, 2012 Filing 76 BRIEF re #75 Response to #69 Motion, of Noatex for Clarification. (Tims, Otis) Modified on 9/20/2012 (dlh).
September 19, 2012 Filing 75 RESPONSE to Motion re #69 MOTION Clarification of Order Remanding to State Court, and Request for Expedited Consideration re #56 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi. (Tims, Otis)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF RESPONSES. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 9/5/12. (bnd)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER of USCA, Withdrawing Dismissal of Mandamus and REMANDING this matter to District Court; REOPENING CASE (jla)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER of USCA RECALLING Mandate re #68 ORDER of USCA DISMISSING Noatex's Petition for Writ of Mandamus re Order remanding case to State Court (jla)
August 27, 2012 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #69 MOTION Clarification of Order Remanding to State Court, and Request for Expedited Consideration re #56 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, . (Simpson, James)
August 27, 2012 Filing 70 AFFIDAVIT re #69 MOTION Clarification of Order Remanding to State Court, and Request for Expedited Consideration re #56 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, Declaration of Osamu Nishiyama. (Simpson, James)
August 27, 2012 Filing 69 MOTION Clarification of Order Remanding to State Court, and Request for Expedited Consideration re #56 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, by Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Simpson, James)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER of USCA DISMISSING Noatex's Petition for Writ of Mandamus re Order remanding case to State Court (jla)
July 20, 2012 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #66 Second MOTION for Reconsideration re #56 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, . (Simpson, James)
July 20, 2012 Filing 66 Second MOTION for Reconsideration re #56 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, by Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Order of Fifth Circuit, #2 Exhibit 2, Petition to Fifth Circuit) (Simpson, James)
July 20, 2012 Remark -Certified copy of Remand Order (document #56) mailed to Lee County Chancery Court (dlh)
July 11, 2012 Filing 65 Transcript of Hearing held 2/8/12, before Judge Alexander. Court Reporter/Transcriber F. Dusty Burdine, Telephone number 228-388-3130. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The Policy is located on our website at www.msnd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2012. (tab) (Main Document 65 replaced on 7/12/2012) (tab).
June 28, 2012 Filing 64 NOTICE by James C. Simpson, Jr on behalf of Noatex Corporation Filing of Transcript (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript) (Simpson, James)
May 14, 2012 Remark: Funds deposited in Court Registry returned to Mitchell, McNutt & Sams per Order #56 on 5/14/12. (jtm)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Added attorney Bertis Wayne Williams for King Construction of Houston, LLC,Bertis Wayne Williams for King Construction of Houston, LLC. Attorney Terry Dwayne Little terminated. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 5/3/12. (mhg)
April 30, 2012 Filing 62 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Little, Terry)
April 23, 2012 Remark- Copy of Remand Order mailed to Lee County Chancery Court (dlh)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying #60 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 4/23/12. (kbt)
April 19, 2012 Filing 60 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Little, Terry)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying #57 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 4/19/12. (wsm)
April 17, 2012 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #57 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Remanding to State Court . (Simpson, James)
April 17, 2012 Filing 57 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Remanding to State Court by Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER finding as moot #39 Motion to Dismiss; granting #50 Motion to Remand to State Court; finding as moot #13 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot #27 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 4/12/12. (tab)
February 24, 2012 Filing 55 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 2/24/2012. (ths)
February 22, 2012 Filing 54 Reply to Response to #50 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #51 Response in Opposition to Motion, #52 Memorandum in Support . (Little, Terry) Modified on 2/23/2012 (dlh).
February 17, 2012 Filing 53 BRIEF re #39 MOTION to Dismiss / Discharge Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Discharge. (Stegall, Martha)
February 15, 2012 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #51 Response in Opposition to #50 Motion to Remand. (Simpson, James) Modified on 2/16/2012 (dlh).
February 15, 2012 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
February 14, 2012 Filing 50 MOTION to Remand to State Court by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Little, Terry)
February 13, 2012 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #45 Response in Opposition to Motion to Discharge Plaintiff. (Simpson, James)
February 13, 2012 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Dismiss / Discharge Plaintiff filed by Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James)
February 9, 2012 Filing 44 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate S. Allan Alexander. (jtm)
February 8, 2012 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before S. Allan Alexander: Motion Hearing held on 2/8/2012 re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Civil Action No. 1:11-CV-251-SA-DAS; Civil Action No. 3:11-CV-137-MPM-SAA; and Civil Action No. 3:11-CV-152-MPM-SAA) filed by King Construction of Houston, LLC, #39 MOTION to Dismiss / Discharge filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi, #13 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Oral Argument filed by Noatex Corporation, #16 MOTION to Deposit Funds for Order Directing Payment into Registry filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi, #27 MOTION to Dismiss Crossclaim filed by Noatex Corporation, #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Robert E. Kohn, filed by Noatex Corporation *Audio Recorded during Proceeding.. (Court Reporter digital.) (wsm)
February 8, 2012 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before S. Allan Alexander: Case Management Conference held on 2/8/2012. (Court Reporter digital.) (wsm)
February 7, 2012 Filing 41 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Terry Dwayne Little on behalf of King Construction of Houston, LLC, King Construction of Houston, LLC to Counsel of Record. (Little, Terry)
February 7, 2012 Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of APMM's Rule 26(a) Disclosures by Martha Bost Stegall on behalf of Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi to All counsel of record. (Stegall, Martha)
February 6, 2012 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss / Discharge by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi. (Stegall, Martha)
February 3, 2012 Filing 38 REPLY (MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT) re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Crossclaim filed by Noatex Corporation. (Simpson, James) Modified on 2/3/2012 (dlh).
February 3, 2012 Filing 37 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #13 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Oral Argument, #27 MOTION to Dismiss Crossclaim : Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2012 09:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 before S. Allan Alexander. (wsm)
February 3, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2012 09:00 AM in Judge Alexander Chambers before S. Allan Alexander. (wsm)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting (39) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:11-cv-00137-WAP-SAA for discovery purposes only; granting(10) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:11-cv-00152-MPM-SAA for discovery purposes only; granting (16) Motion to Deposit Funds; granting (18) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:11-cv-00251-SA-SAA for discovery purposes only; and conditional Notice of Hearing. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 2/1/2012. (ths)
February 1, 2012 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander. (gpk)
January 27, 2012 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #33 Response to #27 Motion, (King Construction of Houston, LLC's Memorandum of Law in Support of Response to Noatex Corporation's Motion (1) to Dismiss Crossclaim Without Leave to Amend or, Alternatively, (2) to Strike Jury Demand). (Little, Terry) Modified on 1/27/2012 (dlh).
January 27, 2012 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Crossclaim (King Construction of Houston, LLC's Response to Noatex Corporation's Motion (1) to Dismiss Crossclaim Without Leave to Amend or, Alternatively, (2) to Strike Jury Demand) filed by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Little, Terry)
January 18, 2012 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Crossclaim , or Alternatively, Motion to Strike Jury Demand. (Simpson, James)
January 17, 2012 Filing 31 REPLY TO RESPONSE to #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Civil Action No. 1:11-CV-251-SA-DAS; Civil Action No. 3:11-CV-137-MPM-SAA; and Civil Action No. 3:11-CV-152-MPM-SAA) (Little, Terry) Modified on 1/17/2012 (jla).
January 17, 2012 Filing 30 CORPORATE STATEMENT of King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Little, Terry)
January 17, 2012 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #16 MOTION to Deposit Funds for Order Directing Payment into Registry (Reply Brief). (Stegall, Martha)
January 17, 2012 Filing 28 EXHIBIT re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Crossclaim Corrected Exhibit C to document # 27. (Simpson, James)
January 13, 2012 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss
January 9, 2012 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #25 Response in Opposition to Motion, #13 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Oral Argument, #16 MOTION to Deposit Funds for Order Directing Payment into Registry . (Simpson, James)
January 9, 2012 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Deposit Funds for Order Directing Payment into Registry REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT filed by Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Application for TRO, #2 Exhibit 2 Regions v. Laurel case, #3 Exhibit 3 Wegmans v. Ancoma case) (Simpson, James)
January 9, 2012 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #23 Response in Opposition to #18 Motion, to Consolidate. (Simpson, James) Modified on 1/9/2012 (dlh).
January 9, 2012 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Civil Action No. 1:11-CV-251-SA-DAS; Civil Action No. 3:11-CV-137-MPM-SAA; and Civil Action No. 3:11-CV-152-MPM-SAA) filed by Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint for Declaratory Relief, #2 Exhibit 2 Order of Recusal, #3 Exhibit 3 Motion to Consolidate) (Simpson, James)
January 5, 2012 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #21 Response to #13 Motion (Memo Brief in Support of Response to Noatex's Motion to Dismiss). (Little, Terry) Modified on 1/6/2012 (dlh).
January 5, 2012 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Oral Argument filed by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Little, Terry)
January 5, 2012 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #19 Response to #13 Motion to Dismiss of Noatex Corporation. (Stegall, Martha) Modified on 1/6/2012 (dlh).
January 5, 2012 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Oral Argument of Noatex Corporation filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi. (Stegall, Martha)
January 5, 2012 Filing 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Civil Action No. 1:11-CV-251-SA-DAS; Civil Action No. 3:11-CV-137-MPM-SAA; and Civil Action No. 3:11-CV-152-MPM-SAA) by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Little, Terry)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Robert E. Kohn for the defendant Noatex Corporation. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/3/2012. (def)
December 23, 2011 Filing 16 MOTION to Deposit Funds for Order Directing Payment into Registry by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi. (Stegall, Martha)
December 23, 2011 Filing 15 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Stegall, Martha)
December 22, 2011 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #13 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Oral Argument . (Simpson, James)
December 22, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Oral Argument by Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Simpson, James)
December 22, 2011 Filing 12 Defenses and ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Noatex Corporation by King Construction of Houston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Purchase Orders, #2 Exhibit B -- Invoices, #3 Exhibit C -- 7-17-11 King E-mail, #4 Exhibit D -- 9-12-11 Hiromi E-mail, #5 Exhibit E -- 9-23-11 Demand Letter from Little to Kohn, #6 Exhibit F -- Lien & Stop Notice filed in Lee Chancery) (Little, Terry)
December 20, 2011 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF STATE COURT CLERK. (jla) (Main Document 11 replaced on 12/22/2011) (jla).
December 12, 2011 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to King Construction of Houston, LLC (jla)
December 12, 2011 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Noatex Corporation (jla)
December 12, 2011 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Noatex Corporation; issued in State Court 11/30/11. (jla)
December 12, 2011 Filing 7 EXHIBIT re #2 Complaint - State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 'B', USDC Complaint, Western Division); filed in State Court 11/15/11 (jla)
December 12, 2011 Filing 6 Notice of Filing of State Court Record, Attorney to send Certificate of State Court Clerk. (jla) Modified on 12/15/2011 (jla).
December 12, 2011 NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #9 Clerk's Notice of Past Due Answer; docketed in error (jla)
December 9, 2011 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martha Bost Stegall on behalf of Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Noatex Corporation served on 12/2/2011. (Stegall, Martha)
December 8, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by James C. Simpson, Jr: $ 100.00, receipt number MSN300006849 as to Robert Kohn (tab)
December 7, 2011 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Robert E. Kohn, by Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Standing) (Simpson, James)
December 6, 2011 Filing 3 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Huffman, Nicole)
December 6, 2011 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (tab)
December 5, 2011 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against King Construction of Houston, LLC, Noatex Corporation, filed by Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi. (tab)
December 5, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Noatex Corporation from Chancery Court of Lee County, MS, case number 11-1657-41-M. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number MSN300006804) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of MS, the removing defendant must file a copy of the entire state court record as an exhibit to its Notice of Removal. If the removing party cannot obtain a copy of the entire state court record by the removal date, then - and only then - the removing party must obtain and deliver to the Office of the Clerk the complete copy of the state court record within 14 days from the date of removal. , filed by Noatex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi v. King Construction of Houston, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto Parts Manufacturing Mississippi Inc.
Represented By: Otis R. Tims
Represented By: Martha Bost Stegall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noatex Corporation
Represented By: James C. Simpson, Jr.
Represented By: Nicole Collins Huffman
Represented By: Robert E. Kohn
Represented By: Jennifer H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Construction of Houston, LLC
Represented By: Bertis Wayne Williams
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Represented By: Terry Dwayne Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohn Law Group, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Simpson, Jr.
Represented By: Donald Alan Windham
Represented By: Robert E. Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?