Johnson et al v. McElroy Truck Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yolanda Johnson
Defendant: McElroy Truck Lines, Inc. and Roy Merritt
Case Number: 1:2014cv00026
Filed: February 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: Michael P. Mills
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 JUDGMENT in favor of McElroy Truck Lines, Inc., Roy Merritt against Rodney Johnson, Yolanda Johnson. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 5/27/15. (rel)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 5/1/2015. (rrz)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying 75 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 4/27/2015. (rrz)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 01/20/2015. (rrz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. McElroy Truck Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Johnson
Represented By: Ned McDonald, III
Represented By: Richard Shane McLaughlin
Represented By: Ned McDonald, III
Represented By: Richard Shane McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McElroy Truck Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Perrin Nelson Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Merritt
Represented By: Perrin Nelson Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?