Hall v. Nunez et al

Plaintiff: Willie Mae Hall
Defendant: Robert L. Nunez, B. L. Sullivan, Winston County Hospital, United States of America and Winston County Family Medical Clinic
Case Number: 1:2014cv00108
Filed: June 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Winston
Presiding Judge: Debra M. Brown
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 4/7/2015. (bkl)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AGREED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/24/2015. (bkl)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING CASE BY REASON OF SETTLEMENT. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 12/4/2014. (bkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Nunez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Mae Hall
Represented By: Alan D. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winston County Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winston County Family Medical Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?