Austin v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Plaintiff: Qua S. Austin
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Case Number: 1:2014cv00190
Filed: October 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Lowndes
Presiding Judge: S. Allan Alexander
Presiding Judge: Glen H. Davidson
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 53 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/28/16. (rel)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER re 44 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by The Secretary of Veterans Affairs, The Secretary of Veterans Affairs terminated.. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 9/17/15. (rel)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 25 Order on 3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 4/22/2015. (dlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qua S. Austin
Represented By: Randolph Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Sheryl Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?