Parker v. Mississippi Department of Public Safety et al
Plaintiff: Rick Parker
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Public Safety, Donnell Berry, Justin Rollins, Josh Boyd and Defendants A, B, C.D, E and F
Case Number: 1:2014cv00231
Filed: December 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Tishomingo
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 85 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 9/13/17. (jla)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 83 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Order on Motion for New Trial. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 8/15/17. (rel)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/28/17. (rel)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Rick Parker against Justin Rollins. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Courtroom Deputy Clerk for Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/28/17. (rel)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 19 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/23/2015. (psk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Mississippi Department of Public Safety et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Parker
Represented By: Adam B. Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnell Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants A, B, C.D, E and F
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?