Cannady v. Clay County Mississippi
Plaintiff: Calvin Cannady
Defendant: Clay County Mississippi
Case Number: 1:2015cv00044
Filed: March 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: Glen H. Davidson
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 107 Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 11/20/17. (mga)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 89 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 9/25/17. (rel) Modified on 9/25/2017 (jla).
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying as premature 47 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 56 Motion to Strike; amending 14 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations to reflect plaintiff's additional claims appearing in complaint that were not addresse d and remain pending; Continuing Trial until Further Order of the Court; directing the Magistrate Judge to immediately conduct an in-person Case Management Conference to set discovery and other pretrial deadlines. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/3/16. (jlm)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER allowing IFP status to continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/4/16. (ncb)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 9/17/15. (rel)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannady v. Clay County Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Cannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay County Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?