Pankey v. Mississippi State University
Plaintiff: Mary Pankey
Defendant: Mississippi State University
Case Number: 1:2015cv00056
Filed: March 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Oktibbeha
Presiding Judge: Neal B. Biggers
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/16/2016. (rrz)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 45 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 9/19/2016. (rrz)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 38 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 7/15/2016. (rrz)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 6/30/2016. (rrz) Modified on 6/30/2016 (jlm).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pankey v. Mississippi State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Pankey
Represented By: Perrin Nelson Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi State University
Represented By: Charles E. Winfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?