Rice v. Tohan et al
Plaintiff: Charlene D. Rice
Defendant: Jose J. Tohan and A & S Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00182
Filed: October 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Pontotoc
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 AGREED ORDER dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/5/2017. (dbm)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER DISMISSING CASE by reason of settlement. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/14/2017. (dbm)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 71 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/23/2017. (dbm)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER dismissing Defendant Jose J. Tohan without prejudice due to incomplete service of process by Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 5/18/2016. (psk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Tohan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene D. Rice
Represented By: Gregory Wayne Harbison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose J. Tohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & S Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Jessie Wayne Doss
Represented By: Dan W. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?