Jones v. FXI, Inc.
Plaintiff: Keith Jones
Defendant: FXI, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00185
Filed: November 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Prentiss
Presiding Judge: Glen H. Davidson
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 AGREED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 8/31/17. (jla)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DISMISSING CASE by reason of settlement. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 8/2/17. (rel)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 62 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 5/15/17. (rel)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AGREED ORDER of DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 1/9/17. (rel)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. FXI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Jones
Represented By: Victor Israel Fleitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FXI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?