Ware v. Sailun Co., Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn Ware
Defendant: Sailun Co., Ltd, Sailun Tire Latin America, LLC, TBC Corporation, TBC Brands, South Gateway Tire Co., Inc., Gateway Tire & Service Center - Starkville and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2016cv00003
Filed: January 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 311 Agreed ORDER amending re 214 Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/11/18. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (def)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 7/27/18. (jla)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 AMENDED ORDER re 170 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Discovery. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 2/28/17. (rel)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER denying as moot 33 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion for Discovery; denying 94 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice 165 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 2/13/17. (rel)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ware v. Sailun Co., Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Ware
Represented By: T. K. Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sailun Co., Ltd
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Edman
Represented By: Benjamin E. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sailun Tire Latin America, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin E. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBC Corporation
Represented By: David A. Barfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBC Brands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Gateway Tire Co., Inc.
Represented By: Robert Ryan Revere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Tire & Service Center - Starkville
Represented By: Robert Ryan Revere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?