Collins v. State of Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Kim Collins
Defendant: State of Mississippi, Mississippi Highway Safety Patrol and Matthew Hood
Case Number: 1:2016cv00007
Filed: January 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Chickasaw
Presiding Judge: Glen H. Davidson
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 35 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 2/26/18. (jtm)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b); claims against the defendant in his official capacity as dismissed, but not as to individual capacity. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 11/13/17. (jla)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 16 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 09/29/2017. (rel)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Stay. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 5/25/16. (rel)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. State of Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Collins
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Highway Safety Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?