Griggs v. Chickasaw County, Mississippi
Plaintiff: Lamon K. Griggs
Defendant: Chickasaw County, Mississippi
Case Number: 1:2016cv00013
Filed: January 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Chickasaw
Presiding Judge: S. Allan Alexander
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting but not to the extent requested 114 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/20/20. (jla)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 107 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 5/3/2018. (adm)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 JUDGMENT in favor of Lamon K. Griggs against Chickasaw County, Mississippi. This CASE is CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/23/2017. (adm)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 67 Motion to Amend Trial Subpoenas. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/17/2017. (adm)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 AMENDED ORDER re 63 Order on Motion in Limine, correcting signature date. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/10/2017. (adm)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion in Limine; granting 54 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/10/2017. (adm)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 59 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/28/2017. (adm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griggs v. Chickasaw County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamon K. Griggs
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chickasaw County, Mississippi
Represented By: Gary L. Carnathan
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?